Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2176939

EP2176939 - INCREASING THE Q FACTOR OF A RESONATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2010/16]
Inventor(s)01 / COOK, Nigel P.
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
02 / SIEBER, Lukas
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2010/16]
Representative(s)Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
[2017/37]
Former [2010/16]O'Neill, Aoife , et al
Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date08795181.011.08.2008
[2010/16]
WO2008US09572
Priority number, dateUS20070954941P09.08.2007         Original published format: US 954941 P
[2010/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009023155
Date:19.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2176939
Date:21.04.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.02.2009
[2010/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2176939
Date:13.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2012
ClassificationInternational:H01P7/00, H02J7/02, H01Q7/00
[2017/15]
Former International [2012/09]H02J17/00, H01P7/00, H02J7/02, H01Q7/00
Former International [2010/16]H02J17/00, H01P7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/37]
Former [2010/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ERHÖHUNG DES Q-FAKTORS EINES RESONATORS[2010/16]
English:INCREASING THE Q FACTOR OF A RESONATOR[2010/16]
French:AUGMENTATION DU FACTEUR DE SURTENSION D'UN RÉSONATEUR[2010/16]
Entry into regional phase05.02.2010National basic fee paid 
05.02.2010Search fee paid 
05.02.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/16]
07.09.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.07.2017Fee for grant paid
06.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.05.2016
Opposition(s)14.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
07.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
MC13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SI13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/35]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
DK13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
IT13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/23]AT13.09.2017
CZ13.09.2017
EE13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
PL13.09.2017
RO13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
SK13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
IS13.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ13.09.2017
ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/15]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
NL13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/12]ES13.09.2017
FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
LV13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
BG13.12.2017
NO13.12.2017
GR14.12.2017
Former [2018/10]FI13.09.2017
HR13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
SE13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI13.09.2017
LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT13.09.2017
NO13.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2007008646  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]; JOANNOPOULOS JOHN D [US]; KARALIS) [A] 1-23 * abstract *;
 [A]US5027709  (SLAGLE GLENN B [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract *
 [Y]  - ANDRE KURS ET AL, "Wireless Power Transfer via strongly Coupled Magnetic Resonances", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20070706), vol. 317, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1143254, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 83 - 86, XP002609542 [Y] 1-23 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1143254
 [Y]  - Karalis, Joannopoulos, Soljacic, "Efficient wireless non-radiative mid-range energy transfer", (20070427), Annals of Physics, URL: http://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0003491607000619, (20120123), XP002667675 [Y] 1-23 * Section 2.2 Capacitively-loaded conducting wire loops , Fig. 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aop.2007.04.017
 [YP]  - KARALIS ET AL, "Efficient wireless non-radiative mid-range energy transfer", ANNALS OF PHYSICS, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20071222), vol. 323, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AOP.2007.04.017, ISSN 0003-4916, pages 34 - 48, XP022399933 [YP] 1-23 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.aop.2007.04.017
International search[Y]US5153583  (GRAHAM A.M. MURDOCH);
 [Y]US7076206  (REINHOLD ELFERICH ET AL.);
 [Y]US5608417  (FRANKLIN B. DE VAIL);
 [A]WO2007048052  (THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF COLORADO)