Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2188991

EP2188991 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR SELECTING ADVERTISEMENTS BASED ON CALLER IDENTIFIER INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  25.09.2015
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.09.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.10.2015  [2015/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUALCOMM Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
For all designated states
Simon, Greogory R.
53 Cragmont Ave.
San Francisco, California 94116 / US
[2014/13]
Former [2010/52]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77707 / US
For all designated states
Simon, Greogory R.
53 Cragmont Ave.
San Francisco, California 94116 / US
Former [2010/21]For all designated states
Palm, Inc.
950 West Maude Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94085-2801 / US
For all designated states
Simon, Greogory R.
53 Cragmont Ave.
San Francisco, California 94116 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SWIFT, Roderick
42 Norman Court
Walnut Creek, California 94595 / US
02 / CHATTERJEE, Manjirnath
111 Gilbert 2
San Francisco, California 94103 / US
 [2010/21]
Representative(s)Potter, Julian Mark
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/21]Potter, Julian Mark
W.P. Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane
GB-London WC2B 5SQ / GB
Application number, filing date08797208.905.08.2008
[2010/21]
WO2008US72238
Priority number, dateUS20070954022P06.08.2007         Original published format: US 954022 P
US2007087330516.10.2007         Original published format: US 873305
US2008001936224.01.2008         Original published format: US 19362
US2008006117902.04.2008         Original published format: US 61179
US2008011669707.05.2008         Original published format: US 116697
US2008018177629.07.2008         Original published format: US 181776
US2008018630305.08.2008         Original published format: US 186303
[2010/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009020973
Date:12.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2188991
Date:26.05.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2009
[2010/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US12.02.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/10
[2010/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/21]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWAHL VON WERBUNGEN AUF DER BASIS VON ANRUFERIDENTIFIKATIONSINFORMATIONEN[2010/21]
English:SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR SELECTING ADVERTISEMENTS BASED ON CALLER IDENTIFIER INFORMATION[2010/21]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉS POUR SÉLECTIONNER DES PUBLICITÉS SUR LA BASE D'INFORMATIONS D'IDENTIFIANT D'APPELANT[2010/21]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2010National basic fee paid 
05.03.2010Search fee paid 
05.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/21]
04.02.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.04.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.04.2015
22.04.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
15.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/44]
25.05.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/44]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[I]US2007033569  (DAVIDSON JAMES G [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]WO2004012094  (ABACO PR INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3,8,11,13,17,20 * * page 1 - page 5 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 16, paragraph 4 * * page 24, paragraph 3 *;
 [I]US2007111712  (RATNAKAR NITESH [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-5, 7C * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0026] *;
 [I]US2006041638  (WHITTAKER THOMAS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2003120500  (DEEDS DOUGLAS [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3B * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0045] *
International search[Y]US2007179846  (JAIN KAMAL [US], et al);
 [Y]US2003018885  (LANDSMAN RICK W [US], et al)