Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2147583

EP2147583 - PLASMA ARC TORCH CUTTING COMPONENT WITH OPTIMIZED WATER COOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.03.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 25.04.2018  [2018/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hypertherm, Inc.
Etna Road
P.O. Box 5010
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
[2012/01]
Former [2010/04]For all designated states
Hypertherm, INC.
Etna Road P.O. Box 5010
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Yong
8 Camp Brook Drive
Hanover NH 03755 / US
02 / COOK, David, Jonathan
1037 Upper Plain
Bradfort VT 05033 / US
 [2010/04]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/04]Johnson, Yvonne Catherine
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date08797423.407.08.2008
[2010/04]
WO2008US72532
Priority number, dateUS2008002876808.02.2008         Original published format: US 28768
[2010/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009099463
Date:13.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/33]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2147583
Date:27.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009
[2010/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2147583
Date:06.04.2011
Language:EN
[2011/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.10.2009
ClassificationInternational:H05H1/34
[2010/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/04]
TitleGerman:PLASMALICHTBOGENBRENNER-SCHNEIDEKOMPONENTE MIT OPTIMIERTER WASSERKÜHLUNG[2010/04]
English:PLASMA ARC TORCH CUTTING COMPONENT WITH OPTIMIZED WATER COOLING[2010/04]
French:COMPOSANT DE CHALUMEAU DE COUPAGE AU PLASMA D'ARC AVEC REFROIDISSEMENT PAR EAU OPTIMISÉ[2010/46]
Former [2010/04]COMPOSANT DE COUPAGE AU CHALUMEAU À ARC PLASMA AVEC REFROIDISSEMENT D'EAU OPTIMISÉ
Entry into regional phase04.11.2009National basic fee paid 
04.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/04]
08.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2011Fee for grant paid
03.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  08.12.2011   
Holma AG Laser & Plasma Consumables
Rietbergstrasse 49
9403 Goldach / CH
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
 02  12.12.2011   
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide, S.A.
Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2012/03]
Opponent(s)01  08.12.2011   
Holma AG Laser & Plasma Consumables
Rietbergstrasse 49
9403 Goldach / CH
Opponent's representative
Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
 02  12.12.2011   
L'AIR LIQUIDE SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75 Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
14.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.08.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
29.08.2012Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
28.12.2012Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
08.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
14.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
12.11.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.01.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition01.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0597/15
19.03.2015Appeal received No.  T0597/15
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
HU06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
MT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
IE07.08.2011
LU07.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GB07.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
[2018/17]
Former [2013/45]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
HU06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
MT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
IE07.08.2011
LU07.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GB07.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
Former [2013/44]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
MT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
TR06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
IE07.08.2011
LU07.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GB07.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
Former [2013/34]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
MT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
IE07.08.2011
LU07.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
GB07.08.2012
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
Former [2013/29]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
MT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
PL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
BG06.07.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
IE07.08.2011
LU07.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
FR31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
CH31.08.2012
LI31.08.2012
Former [2012/10]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
DK06.04.2011
EE06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
MT06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
RO06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2012/02]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
NL06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2012/01]AT06.04.2011
BE06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/52]AT06.04.2011
CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/50]CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
LV06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
IS06.08.2011
PT08.08.2011
PL22.08.2011
Former [2011/49]CY06.04.2011
FI06.04.2011
HR06.04.2011
LT06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
NO06.07.2011
GR07.07.2011
ES17.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/48]LT06.04.2011
SE06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
NO06.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/47]LT06.04.2011
SI06.04.2011
NO06.07.2011
PT08.08.2011
Former [2011/41]SI06.04.2011
Cited inInternational search[E]EP2034805  (THERMAL DYNAMICS CORP [US]) [E] 24 * figure 2 *;
 [A]US6320156  (YAMAGUCHI YOSHIHIRO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,3,5,7,12-15,17,20-24 * column 12, line 12 - line 19 * * column 13, line 61 - column 14, line 10 * * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US2007045245  (BRANDT AARON D [US] ET AL) [A] 1,7,12,17,20-22,24 * paragraph [0065]; figure 11 *;
 [A]US2005133484  (DELZENNE MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1,24 * figure 4b *