Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2324433

EP2324433 - CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM USING TRANSPORTABLE MEMORY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TiVo Solutions Inc.
2160 Gold Street
San Jose CA 95002 / US
[2017/52]
Former [2017/13]For all designated states
TiVo Solutions Inc.
2 Circle Star Way
San Carlos, CA 94070 / US
Former [2017/11]For all designated states
TiVo Solutions Inc.
2160 Gold Street
P.O. Box 2160
Alviso, CA 95002-2160 / US
Former [2011/21]For all designated states
TiVo Inc.
2160 Gold Street
Alviso, CA 95002 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARTON, James
2160 Gold Street
Alviso California 95002 / US
 [2011/21]
Representative(s)Pisani, Diana Jean
Haley Guiliano International LLP
26-28 Bedford Row
London WC1R 4HE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/21]Dendorfer, Claus
Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date08797830.013.08.2008
[2011/21]
WO2008US73075
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010019142
Date:18.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2324433
Date:25.05.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010
[2011/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.02.2010
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/00, G06F13/00, G06Q30/00
[2011/52]
Former International [2011/21]G06F17/00, G06F13/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/21]
TitleGerman:TRANSPORTIERBARE SPEICHERANORDNUNGEN VERWENDENDES INHALTSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM[2011/21]
English:CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM USING TRANSPORTABLE MEMORY DEVICES[2011/21]
French:SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU À L'AIDE DE DISPOSITIFS DE MÉMOIRE TRANSPORTABLES[2011/21]
Entry into regional phase18.02.2011National basic fee paid 
18.02.2011Search fee paid 
18.02.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2011Examination requested  [2011/21]
01.08.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
11.10.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
08.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination18.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0864/17
20.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)EP17210598.3  / EP3349122
EP17210599.1  / EP3349167
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.02.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
11.10.2012Request for further processing filed
11.10.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.10.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
05.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2007082190  (QUALCOMM INC [US]; COLLINS BRUCE [US]; WALKER GORDON KENT [US]; BROWN) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0090] *;
 [I]US2008004954  (HORVITZ ERIC J [US]) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2005210101  (JANIK);
 [Y]US2002147985  (MIYAJIMA ET AL.);
 [Y]US2008015932  (HAEUSER ET AL.)