Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2337890

EP2337890 - Use of a friction stabilizer in a polymer jacket material of a cord and corresponding method of making a cord assembly comprising a jacket [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2011/26]CORD AND POLYMER JACKET ASSEMBLY HAVING A FRICTION STABILIZER IN THE POLYMER JACKET MATERIAL
[2013/06]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.07.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
27.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
One Carrier Place
Farmington CT 06032 / US
[2017/36]
Former [2011/26]For all designated states
Otis Elevator Company
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032-2568 / US
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Xiaomei
102 Gates Farm Road
Glastonbury Connecticut 06033 / US
02 / KRISHNAN, Gopal, R.
18 Ridgecrest Place
Wethersfield Connecticut 06109 / US
03 / WESSON, John, P.
39 Donnell Road
Vernon CT 06066 / US
04 / MILTON-BENOIT, John, M.
1554 North Stone Street
West Suffield Connecticut 06093 / US
 [2011/26]
Representative(s)Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Pelkovenstraße 143
80992 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/33]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2011/26]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date08797931.615.08.2008
[2011/26]
WO2008US73231
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2010019149
Date:18.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2337890
Date:29.06.2011
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2010
[2011/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2337890
Date:14.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.2010
ClassificationInternational:D07B1/16, C08J5/10
[2011/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2011/26]
TitleGerman:Verwendung eines Reibungsstablisators in einem polymeren Mantel eines Seils und entsprechendes Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Seilverbunds mit einem Mantel[2013/06]
English:Use of a friction stabilizer in a polymer jacket material of a cord and corresponding method of making a cord assembly comprising a jacket[2013/06]
French:Utilisation d'un stabilisateur de frottemment dans une gaine en polymère d'une corde et procédé correspondant[2013/06]
Former [2011/26]VERBUND AUS SEIL UND KUNSTSTOFFUMHÜLLUNG MIT REIBUNGSSTABILISATOR IN KUNSTSTOFF
Former [2011/26]CORD AND POLYMER JACKET ASSEMBLY HAVING A FRICTION STABILIZER IN THE POLYMER JACKET MATERIAL
Former [2011/26]ENSEMBLE CORDE ET VESTE POLYMÈRE PRÉSENTANT UN STABILISATEUR DE FROTTEMENT DANS LE MATÉRIAU DE VESTE POLYMÈRE
Entry into regional phase11.03.2011National basic fee paid 
11.03.2011Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2011Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/26]
07.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2013Fee for grant paid
28.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.02.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.05.2014   
INVENTIO AG
Seestrasse 55
6052 Hergiswil / CH
 [2014/25]
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
18.06.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.12.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.01.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.03.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition17.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1233/16
04.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU15.08.2008
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IE15.08.2013
LU15.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
GB15.08.2015
TR15.08.2015
IT15.08.2016
[2017/45]
Former [2016/34]HU15.08.2008
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IE15.08.2013
LU15.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
GB15.08.2015
Former [2015/34]HU15.08.2008
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
BG14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IE15.08.2013
LU15.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2015/32]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
MT14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IE15.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/33]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
IE15.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/25]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
MC14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/23]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
CZ14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
EE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
SK14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/22]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
NL14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
RO14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/21]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
DK14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/20]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
CH31.08.2013
LI31.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/18]AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
CY14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/14]CY24.07.2013
AT14.08.2013
BE14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY24.07.2013
AT14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
LV14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
SI14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
GR15.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY24.07.2013
AT14.08.2013
FI14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
PL14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/10]CY24.07.2013
AT14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
IS14.12.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/09]AT14.08.2013
HR14.08.2013
LT14.08.2013
SE14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/08]LT14.08.2013
NO14.11.2013
PT16.12.2013
Former [2014/07]NO14.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007050069  (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,15 * page 1, line 21 - line 24 * * page 2, line 8 - page 3, line 4 * * page 7, line 3 - page 9, line 10 * * page 10, line 18 - line 23; figures 1-3,5 *;
 [A]US2003024770  (O'DONNELL HUGH JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0006] , [0013]; figure - *;
 [X]JPH06146010  (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al) [X] 1,2,15,17 * abstract *;
 [X]US3137990  (CARRANZA WILLIAM L) [X] 1,15 * column 1, line 24 - line 71; figure - *;
 [X]JPH11247078  (TOKIWA CHEM IND LTD, et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract *;
 [X]JP2004131897  (TOKYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1,15 * abstract *;
 [XY]DE29924773U  (OTIS ELEVATOR CO [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0001] , [0040]; figure - * [Y] 2-7;
 [Y]US2006182967  (KOSAKA KAZUNARI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0048] *
ExaminationEP1927608
by applicantUS6295799
 US6739433
 US4982829
 US6540060
 WO2007050069