Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2215124 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP08798550 EP13151343 EP13151352 EP13151375 EP13151381 EP16204336



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015087819Global Dossier 26.03.2015A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US201414562546 05.12.2014
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2015031870Global Dossier 29.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US201414487932 16.09.2014
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014357854Global Dossier 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US201414459844 14.08.2014
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2014357850Global Dossier 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US201414459777 14.08.2014
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013085265Global Dossier 04.04.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US201213422887 16.03.2012
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013079502Global Dossier 28.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US201213682698 20.11.2012
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013079501Global Dossier 28.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201213422904 16.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013072665Global Dossier 21.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US90308410 12.10.2010
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US201113174423 30.06.2011
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201213619555 14.09.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013058944Global Dossier 07.03.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201213655984 19.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2013052201Global Dossier 28.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US201213656392 19.10.2012
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2012251544Global Dossier 04.10.2012A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201213494912 12.06.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2012213797Global Dossier 23.08.2012A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US201213463751 03.05.2012
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2012027765Global Dossier 02.02.2012A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113252016 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2011027287Global Dossier 03.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US90308410 12.10.2010
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9920134Global Dossier 20.03.2018B2
US2012093818 19.04.2012A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US90308410 12.10.2010
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US201113174423 30.06.2011
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9493576Global Dossier 15.11.2016B2
US2014357851 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US201414459787 14.08.2014
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9056915Global Dossier 16.06.2015B2
US2014357853 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US201414459768 14.08.2014
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9045547Global Dossier 02.06.2015B2
US2012020975 26.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8981064Global Dossier 17.03.2015B2
US2014357852 04.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US201414459743 14.08.2014
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8889834Global Dossier 18.11.2014B2
US2014235831 21.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US201414260985 24.04.2014
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8883983Global Dossier 11.11.2014B2
US2014228547 14.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414261065 24.04.2014
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8871914Global Dossier 28.10.2014B2
US2014228557 14.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US201414261063 24.04.2014
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8871913Global Dossier 28.10.2014B2
US2014235830 21.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US201414260975 24.04.2014
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8859741Global Dossier 14.10.2014B2
US2014228545 14.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US201414261087 24.04.2014
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201113251909 03.10.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8829165Global Dossier 09.09.2014B2
US2013245235 19.09.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US201313860016 10.04.2013
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
US201213655984 19.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8563698Global Dossier 22.10.2013B2
US2009326202 31.12.2009A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US47417609 28.05.2009
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8168762Global Dossier 01.05.2012B2
US2012020976 26.01.2012A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US201113251955 03.10.2011
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8030457Global Dossier 04.10.2011B2
US2009142352 04.06.2009A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
US19709308 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20180035947Global Dossier 06.04.2018A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20170012592Global Dossier 02.02.2017A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101702194BGlobal Dossier 03.02.2017B1
KR20140064962 28.05.2014A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR101494932BGlobal Dossier 26.02.2015B1
KR20100057070 28.05.2010A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP5441905BGlobal Dossier 12.03.2014B2
JP2010536384 02.12.2010A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3202791Global Dossier 09.08.2017A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
EP16178361 22.08.2008
US896507 21.12.2007
EP08798550 22.08.2008
EP15202482 22.08.2008
EP16189650 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
EP16164634 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2641918Global Dossier 05.03.2014A3
EP2641918 25.09.2013A2
Priority number Date
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2641917Global Dossier 19.02.2014A3
EP2641917 25.09.2013A2
Priority number Date
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2615114Global Dossier 20.11.2013A3
EP2615114 17.07.2013A2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2615113Global Dossier 13.11.2013A3
EP2615113 17.07.2013A2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2696252Global Dossier 14.06.2016C
CA2696252 26.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2215124Global Dossier 24.02.2016B1
EP2215124 11.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AR110799 02.05.2019A2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2008288791B 30.10.2014B2
AU2008288791 26.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013203677C 25.05.2017C1
AU2013203677B 14.01.2016B2
AU2013203677 16.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
AU2013203677 11.04.2013
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013203685B 11.08.2016B2
AU2013203685 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
AU2013203685 11.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013203689B 11.08.2016B2
AU2013203689 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
AU2013203689 11.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013203725 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
AU2013203725 11.04.2013
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013203733 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
AU2013203733 11.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013203748C 25.05.2017C1
AU2013203748B 28.01.2016B2
AU2013203748 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
AU2013203748 11.04.2013
US896507 21.12.2007
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013203751B 22.09.2016B2
AU2013203751 02.05.2013A1
Priority number Date
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
AU2013203751 11.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2016262656 08.12.2016A1
Priority number Date
AU2016262656 21.11.2016
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
AU2013203751 11.04.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2018247211 01.11.2018A1
Priority number Date
AU2016262656 21.11.2016
AU2008288791 22.08.2008
AU2013203751 11.04.2013
AU2018247211 09.10.2018
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BRPI0816117 18.12.2018B1
BRPI0816117 10.03.2015A2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR122018012430 08.10.2019B1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
BRPI0816117 22.08.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN101932607B 25.06.2014B
CN101932607 29.12.2010A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CY1117940T 26.04.2017T1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK2215124T 30.05.2016T3
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA032106 30.04.2019B1
EA201000356 30.08.2010A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EA201892670 29.11.2019A1
Priority number Date
US896507 21.12.2007
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2573258T 06.06.2016T3
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1143824 04.11.2016A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HRP20160494T 03.06.2016T1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HUS1600029I 28.09.2016I1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HUS1600036I 28.10.2016I1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL204013 31.07.2017A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL252616D 31.07.2017D0
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LTPA2016025I 12.09.2016I1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LU93096I 01.08.2016I2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
LU93180I 18.10.2016I2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MA31978 03.01.2011B1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MX2010001921 11.03.2010A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO2016010I 03.06.2016I1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NO2016015I 12.08.2016I1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ584101 28.09.2012A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ705644 25.11.2016A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
NZ61864108 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PH12013502285 08.08.2016A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PH12013502286 22.02.2016A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL2215124T 31.08.2016T3
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RS54756 31.10.2016B1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SI2215124T 30.09.2016T1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
EP08798550 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TN2010000063 26.09.2011A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA108734 10.06.2015C2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
WO2008US74097 22.08.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009026558Global Dossier 26.02.2009A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2018118974Global Dossier 02.08.2018A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2016182114Global Dossier 20.10.2016A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5906333BGlobal Dossier 20.04.2016B2
JP2015166345 24.09.2015A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP5705288BGlobal Dossier 22.04.2015B2
JP2014043446 13.03.2014A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AR068011 28.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CL2008002495 04.09.2009A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104311665 28.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104311666 28.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104311667 28.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CO6230997 20.12.2010A2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CR11328 12.07.2010A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE202008018562U 02.11.2015U1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HUE028162T 28.12.2016T2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NL300818I 14.07.2016I2
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE20091006 14.08.2009A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE20131400 16.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE20140014 31.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE20140220 21.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE20140221 21.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE20140231 08.03.2014A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PE20180173 22.01.2018A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG184702 30.10.2012A1
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
SG10201710183T 30.01.2018A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI441833B 21.06.2014B
TW200916481 16.04.2009A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TWI633122B 21.08.2018B
TW201716444 16.05.2017A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201500374 01.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201500375 01.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201500376 01.01.2015A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW201906871 16.02.2019A
Priority number Date
US95766807 23.08.2007
US896507 21.12.2007
US8613308 04.08.2008
US1063008 09.01.2008
TypeType Divisional application
 EP2615113
 EP2641917
 EP2615114
  Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 16.02.2013
 EP2641918
  Application refused  : 12.06.2016
  Application refused  : 08.10.2016
  Application refused  : 10.09.2016
  Application refused  : 16.02.2017
  Application refused  : 05.02.2017
 EP3202791