blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2215124

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BG 
 CH 
CY 
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EE 
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GR 
 HR 
 HU 
 IE 
 IS 
 IT 
 LI 
 LT 
 LU 
LV 
 MC 
 MT 
 NL 
 NO 
 PL 
 PT 
 RO 
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 TR 
Examination procedure16.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase18.03.2010National basic fee paid 
18.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
European patent granted24.02.2016
Opposition procedure08.03.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Appeal following opposition08.05.2019APPEAL FILED
18.07.2019APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
30.11.2018APPEAL FILED
18.07.2019APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
30.11.2018APPEAL FILED
08.07.2019APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:11.08.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20100318
 
Event date:11.08.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:11.08.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:14.01.2011 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK DE 1143824 HK
Code Expl.: REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:02.02.2011 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20110105
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 3/06 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/405 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/505 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/366 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/395 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 16/40 20060101AFI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/44 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/66 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/47 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/22 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/40 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:20.11.2013 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 45/06 20060101ALI20131014BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/405 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20151215
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/47 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/40 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/366 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/00 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C07K 16/40 20060101AFI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61P 3/06 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/22 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 39/395 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/44 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 45/06 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/66 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61K 31/505 20060101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:13.01.2016 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:C12N 15/113 20100101ALI20151207BHEP
 
Event date:24.02.2016 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA MK RS
 
Event date:24.02.2016 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:24.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:24.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602008042526 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:29.02.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI
 
Event date:15.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 776693 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20160315
 
Event date:23.03.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:30.03.2016 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:SANOFI
Effective DATE:20160224
 
Event date:07.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602008042526 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
 
Event date:27.04.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:CLAIM LODGED; CLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED AT THE PATENTS COURT ON 24 MARCH 2016. (HP-2016-000017)
 
Event date:10.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG RO EPE
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA
 
Event date:13.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PT SC4A
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE
Free Format Text:AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION
Effective DATE:20160509
 
Event date:30.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
Effective DATE:20160525
 
Event date:01.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL FP
Code Expl.: TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)
 
Event date:02.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20160024
 
Event date:03.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:16C0025
Filing DATE:20160603
 
Event date:06.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2573258 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20160606
 
Event date:07.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:13.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO SPCF
Code Expl.: FILING OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150805
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2016010
Filing DATE:20160603
 
Event date:15.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 65622 05.02.2016
Filing DATE:20160603
 
Event date:15.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:300818
Filing DATE:20160603
Expiry DATE:20280821
Extension DATE:20300720
 
Event date:21.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R065
Code Expl.:+REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150717
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122016000042
Filing DATE:20160603
Expiry DATE:20280823
 
Event date:27.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT SPCF
Code Expl.: FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMABUM; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU1/15/1016 20150717
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:PA2016021
Filing DATE:20160602
Expiry DATE:20280822
 
Event date:28.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150717
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:1690026-8
 
Event date:29.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE SPCF
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016/001 EU/1/15/1016/005 20150717
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2016/025
Filing DATE:20160602
 
Event date:29.06.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/15/1016 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB16/034
Filing DATE:20160602
 
Event date:11.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO T2
Code Expl.:+ENTRY OF EP PATENT INTO NATIONAL PHASE OF NORWAY
Effective DATE:20160224
 
Event date:12.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:15.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT SPCF 776693 AT T
Code Expl.:+FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMBAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 (MITTEILUNG) 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:26/2016
Filing DATE:20160602
Effective DATE:20160715
 
Event date:15.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE AA1Y E011954 EE
Code Expl.:+SPC FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMABUM;REG NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 21.07.2015
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20160021
Filing DATE:20160602
 
Event date:15.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE FG4A E011954 EE
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA
Effective DATE:20160510
 
Event date:20.07.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SPCG
Code Expl.:+GRANT OF A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:300818
Filing DATE:20160603
Expiry DATE:20280821
Extension DATE:20300720
Effective DATE:20160714
 
Event date:01.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU CCP
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB ET SES DERIVES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES (REPATHA); FIRST REGISTRATION DATE: 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:93096
Extension DATE:20300721
 
Event date:19.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CP
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150925
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:16C0035
Filing DATE:20160819
 
Event date:22.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NO SPCF
Code Expl.: FILING OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROKUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20151001
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2016015
Filing DATE:20160812
 
Event date:24.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FI SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE APPLICATION FILED
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20160034
 
Event date:31.08.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150925
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:300827
Filing DATE:20160823
Expiry DATE:20280821
Extension DATE:20300924
 
Event date:12.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT SPCF
Code Expl.: FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROKUMABAS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150923
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:PA2016025
Filing DATE:20160816
Expiry DATE:20280822
 
Event date:14.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB CTFF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/15/1031 20150925
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:SPC/GB16/048
Filing DATE:20160816
 
Event date:15.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG EE AA1Y E011954 EE
Code Expl.:+SPC FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMABUM;REG NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 25.09.2015
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C20160028
Filing DATE:20160817
 
Event date:20.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROKUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150923
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:1690035-9
 
Event date:21.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE SPCF
Code Expl.: REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031/001 EU/1/15/1031/012 20150923
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:2016/036
Filing DATE:20160823
 
Event date:28.09.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AA1S E028162
Code Expl.:+INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: AVOLOCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150717
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:S1600029
Filing DATE:20160603
 
Event date:03.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GR EP 20160400914 GR
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE
Effective DATE:20160628
 
Event date:15.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT SPCF 776693 AT T
Code Expl.:+FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 (MITTEILUNG) 20150925
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:36/2016
Filing DATE:20160817
Effective DATE:20161015
 
Event date:18.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LU CCP
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB OU UN DERIVE PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLE DE CELUI-CI (PRALUENT); FIRST REGISTRATION DATE: 20150923
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:93180
Extension DATE:20300923
 
Event date:28.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AA1S E028162
Code Expl.:+INFORMATION ON APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150923
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:S1600036
Filing DATE:20160819
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH SPCF
Code Expl.: SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 65661 22.04.2016
Filing DATE:20161019
 
Event date:31.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK CTFF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:CA 2016 00027
Filing DATE:20160603
Expiry DATE:20280822
Extension DATE:20300721
 
Event date:02.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK SPCF
Code Expl.:+FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOKUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:5013-2016
Filing DATE:20160603
 
Event date:02.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 21240 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN
 
Event date:02.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R065
Code Expl.:+REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150923
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:122016000059
Filing DATE:20160812
Expiry DATE:20280823
 
Event date:04.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HK GR 1143824 HK
Code Expl.:+STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG
 
Event date:28.11.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK CTFF
Code Expl.: APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150925
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:CA 2016 00037
Filing DATE:20160823
Expiry DATE:20280822
Extension DATE:20300925
 
Event date:01.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T4 E 21240 SK
Code Expl.: CHANGED SLOVAKIAN TRANSLATION OF A EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION (CHANGED OR MODIFIED BY OWNER)
 
Event date:28.12.2016 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Effective DATE:20161124
 
Event date:28.12.2016 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:STRAWMAN LIMITED
Effective DATE:20161122
 
Event date:28.12.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG HU AG4A E028162 HU
Code Expl.:+FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS
 
Event date:04.01.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Effective DATE:20161124
 
Event date:04.01.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:SANOFI-AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH/SANOFI-AVENTIS GRO
Effective DATE:20161124
 
Event date:15.03.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB S72Z
Code Expl.: CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)
Free Format Text:COUNTERCLAIM LODGED; COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION LODGED AT THE PATENTS COURT ON 30 SEPTEMBER 2016 (HP-2016-000037)
 
Event date:03.05.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK SPCF
Code Expl.:+FILING AN SPC
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROKUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150925
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:5020-2016
Filing DATE:20160823
 
Event date:13.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCG
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROKUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1031 20150925
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:1690035-9
Expiry DATE:20280823
Extension DATE:20300924
 
Event date:13.06.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE SPCG
Code Expl.:+SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:1690026-8
Expiry DATE:20280823
Extension DATE:20300720
 
Event date:14.07.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10
 
Event date:08.06.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR CT
Code Expl.:+GRANTED SUPPLEMENTARY CERTIFICATE OF PROTECTION FOR MEDICINE (EEC REGULATION OF 18 JUNE 1992)
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: EVOLOCUMAB; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/15/1016 20150721
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:16C0025
Filing DATE:20160603
Extension DATE:20300721
 
Event date:12.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:20.07.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR AV
Code Expl.: OTHER ACT AFFECTING THE EXISTENCE OR THE VALIDITY OF AN INDUSTRIAL PROPERTY RIGHT
Effective DATE:20180614
 
Event date:28.09.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:20180808
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20180815
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20180903
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MC
Payment DATE:20180730
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IE
Payment DATE:20180809
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NO
Payment DATE:20180809
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20180823
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20180712
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180807
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LT
Payment DATE:20180720
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:EE
Payment DATE:20180721
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.10.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:RO
Payment DATE:20180723
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20180725
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IS
Payment DATE:20180706
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:TR
Payment DATE:20180812
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HU
Payment DATE:20180724
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20180809
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:HR
Payment DATE:20180718
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GR
Payment DATE:20180716
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20180713
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20180801
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20180810
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20180822
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BG
Payment DATE:20180727
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20180817
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20180810
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20180712
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20180717
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LV
Payment DATE:20180727
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:30.11.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20180725
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.12.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:PT
Payment DATE:20180822
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.01.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:MT
Payment DATE:20180816
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:09.04.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES SPCD
Code Expl.:-SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE REJECTED
Free Format Text:PRODUCT NAME: ALIROCUMAB; NATIONAL AUTHORISATION NUMBER: EU/1/15/1031; DATE OF AUTHORISATION: 20150923; NUMBER OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EUROPEAN ECONOMIC AREA (EEA): EU/1/15/1031; DATE OF FIRST AUTHORISATION IN EEA: 20150923
SPC Suppl Protection Certif:C201630048
Effective DATE:20190403
 
Event date:30.04.2019 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CY
Payment DATE:20180706
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:15.08.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT UEP 776693 AT T
Code Expl.:+PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION
Effective DATE:20160224