Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2198409 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2198409



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1049
02.09.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
11.11.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
04.10.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.09.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.09.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 9
17.09.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 10
17.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
15.05.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
15.05.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 4
15.05.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
02.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 6
02.05.2019 Description Search / examination 6
02.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.05.2019 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
02.04.2019 Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents Search / examination 1
26.03.2019 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 2
19.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.03.2019 Communication about missing proof of delivery Appeal 1
21.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Search / examination 16
21.02.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
21.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.02.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Search / examination 1
24.01.2019 Claims submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 6
24.01.2019 Description submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 6
24.01.2019 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
24.01.2019 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 3
16.01.2019 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
16.01.2019 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
16.01.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
18.12.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 5
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 5
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 5
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 5
18.12.2018 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 7
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Claims Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 5
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 2
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 5
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 5
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 5
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Description Appeal 6
18.12.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
18.12.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 23
18.12.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
30.08.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 5
25.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
20.07.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
20.07.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.07.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
28.06.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
28.05.2018 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
17.05.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Appeal 4
25.03.2015 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
20.06.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
17.04.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
28.03.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
28.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
28.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
28.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
28.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 7
28.03.2014 Claims Appeal 7
28.03.2014 Claims Appeal 6
28.03.2014 Claims Appeal 6
28.03.2014 Claims Appeal 6
28.03.2014 Claims Appeal 6
28.03.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.03.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
28.03.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 16
28.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
28.01.2014 Cover sheet for fax transmission Appeal 1
28.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
28.01.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
28.01.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Annex to a communication Search / examination 31
18.11.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.11.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
18.11.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 10
18.11.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
18.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
18.11.2013 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
10.09.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
05.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.08.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
16.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
16.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
16.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
16.08.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 7
16.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 6
16.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 7
16.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 6
16.08.2013 Claims Search / examination 6
16.08.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.08.2013 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 9
10.05.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.05.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
16.04.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 1
16.04.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
01.08.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.07.2012 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.01.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
11.01.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
11.01.2011 Claims Search / examination 6
11.01.2011 Description Search / examination 4
11.01.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.01.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
01.09.2010 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
01.09.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
01.09.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
25.06.2010 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 4
10.06.2010 Communication concerning signing of documents Search / examination 1
04.06.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
04.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
04.06.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
01.06.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
01.06.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 12
01.06.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
01.06.2010 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
01.06.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.05.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.04.2010 Communication concerning correction of deficiences in Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
31.03.2010 Claims Search / examination 12
31.03.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.03.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
18.03.2010 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 12
18.03.2010 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
15.01.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
23.10.2009 Annex to International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 12
23.10.2009 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.10.2009 International preliminary examination report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.10.2009 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
23.10.2009 International preliminary examination report - free text sheet PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
23.10.2009 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.10.2009 International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII PCT Chapter 2 procedure 2
23.10.2009 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.10.2009 Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
23.06.2009 Notification of election of EPO Search / examination 1
05.06.2009 Notification of documents sent to WIPO PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
05.06.2009 Notification of receipt of demand PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
02.06.2009 Letter regarding PCTII procedure PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
02.06.2009 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
02.06.2009 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 14
02.06.2009 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 12
29.05.2009 Document concerning fees and payments PCT Chapter 2 procedure 1
29.05.2009 PCT demand form PCT Chapter 2 procedure 3
29.05.2009 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 14
29.05.2009 PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims PCT Chapter 2 procedure 12
29.05.2009 Reply to International Search Opinion PCT Chapter 2 procedure 5
01.04.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 55
01.04.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
12.03.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.03.2009 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 41
25.11.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 2
25.11.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
25.11.2008 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 3
10.09.2008 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
10.09.2008 Claims International Searching Authority 12
10.09.2008 Description International Searching Authority 25
10.09.2008 Drawings International Searching Authority 2
10.09.2008 Submission concerning representation International Searching Authority 2