Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2193484

EP2193484 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EVALUATING VIRTUALIZED ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.03.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cirba IP Inc.
400-179 Enterprise Boulevard
Markham
Ontario L6G 0E7 / CA
[2019/08]
Former [2016/29]For all designated states
Cirba IP Inc.
45 Vogell Road
Suite 600
Richmond Hill, ON L4B 3P6 / CA
Former [2010/23]For all designated states
Cirba Inc.
Suite 400 1595 16th Avenue
Richmond Hill, ON L4B 3N9 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / YUYITUNG, Tom S.
355 Brookdale Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M5M 1P9 / CA
02 / HILLIER, Andrew D.
107 Hilton Avenue
Toronto, Ontario M5R 3E8 / CA
 [2010/23]
Representative(s)Mathys & Squire
The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/23]Garratt, Peter Douglas , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London
EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date08800249.829.08.2008
[2010/23]
WO2008CA01522
Priority number, dateUS20070969344P31.08.2007         Original published format: US 969344 P
[2010/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009026703
Date:05.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2193484
Date:09.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2009
[2010/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CA05.03.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G06F1/28, G06F17/50
[2010/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/23]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUSWERTUNG VIRTUALISIERTER UMGEBUNGEN[2010/23]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR EVALUATING VIRTUALIZED ENVIRONMENTS[2010/23]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR ÉVALUER DES ENVIRONNEMENTS VIRTUALISÉS[2010/23]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2010National basic fee paid 
12.03.2010Search fee paid 
12.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/23]
08.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2013Date of oral proceedings
19.12.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
19.12.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination28.02.2014Appeal received No.  T1083/14
29.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.09.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[L]  - The claimed subject matter, with due regard to the description and drawings, relates inter alia to processes comprised in the list of subject matter and activities excluded from patentability under Art. 52(2) and (3) EPC. The Applicant is advised that in accordance with the established practice of the EPO no search need be performed in respect of those aspects of the invention. The only identifiable technical aspects of the claimed invention relate to the use of conventional, general purpose data processing technology for processing data of an inherently non-technical nature. The information technology employed is considered to have been generally known as it was widely available to everyone at the date of filing/priority of the present application. The notoriety of such prior art cannot reasonably be contested. Accordingly, no documentary evidence is considered required, as the technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of the common general knowledge. For further details see the Notice from the European Patent Office dated 1 October 2007 (OJ 11/2007; p592-593) and the accompanying opinion. [L] 1-9
International search[A]CA2382017  ;
 [A]CA2486103  ;
 [A]US2007094375  ;
 [A]US2007106769  ;
 [T]US2008256530
 [Y]  - ANDREW HILLIER, "A Quantitative and Analytical Approach to Server Consolidation", CIRBA, (200601), XP008145468
 [A]  - "Virtualization:architectural considerations and other evaluation criteria", VMWARE, (2005), XP008132547
 [A]  - "A blueprint for better management from the desktop to the data center", NOVELL, (200702), XP008131054
 [XP]  - ANDREW HILLIER, "Transformational analytics:virtualizing IT environments", CIRBA, (200804), XP008135210