blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2269788 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2269788



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 254
27.08.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
12.08.2015 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
03.03.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
30.01.2015 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
22.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
22.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
21.01.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
09.12.2014 Correction to published European patent application/patent specification Search / examination 1
02.12.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.11.2014 Request for correction of the publication Search / examination 2
08.10.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.09.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
05.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
05.09.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
11.08.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
11.08.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
11.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.07.2014 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
15.04.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
15.04.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
15.04.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
15.02.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
15.02.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 8
10.10.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
10.10.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.06.2012 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.02.2012 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
22.02.2012 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
22.02.2012 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
22.02.2012 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 8
04.11.2011 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
26.09.2011 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
07.09.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.09.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 5
07.09.2011 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
24.06.2011 Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application Search / examination 2
29.04.2011 Invitation to indicate the claims to be searched Search / examination 2
22.03.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
24.02.2011 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
23.02.2011 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.02.2011 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
15.02.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
01.02.2011 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.01.2011 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 2
17.01.2011 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
05.01.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.12.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.11.2010 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.11.2010 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
04.11.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
04.11.2010 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
18.10.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.10.2010 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.10.2010 Claims Search / examination 2
18.10.2010 Description Search / examination 14
18.10.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.10.2010 Drawings Search / examination 7
18.10.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
27.08.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
11.11.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 25
22.10.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.10.2009 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 3
22.10.2009 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 24