blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2269788
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8709578Global Dossier 29.04.2014B2
US2011027529 03.02.2011A1
Priority number Date
CN200810093764 18.04.2008
WO2008CN01596 09.09.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2269788Global Dossier 18.02.2015B8
EP2269788 08.10.2014B1
EP2269788 05.10.2011A4
EP2269788 05.01.2011A1
Priority number Date
CN200810093764 18.04.2008
WO2008CN01596 09.09.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2008355033B 10.01.2013B2
AU2008355033 22.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
CN200810093764 18.04.2008
WO2008CN01596 09.09.2008
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2527945T 02.02.2015T3
Priority number Date
CN200810093764 18.04.2008
WO2008CN01596 09.09.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2009127092Global Dossier 22.10.2009A1
Priority number Date
CN200810093764 18.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN100572009C 23.12.2009C
CN101259631 10.09.2008A
Priority number Date
CN200810093764 18.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MY152318 15.09.2014A
Priority number Date
CN200810093764 18.04.2008
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
RU2446940 10.04.2012C1
Priority number Date
CN200810093764 18.04.2008