Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2190954

EP2190954 - GASIFICATION REACTOR AND METHOD FOR ENTRAINED-FLOW GASIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.03.2013
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.11.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
thyssenkrupp Industrial Solutions AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
[2018/35]
Former [2015/08]For all designated states
ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG
ThyssenKrupp Allee 1
45143 Essen / DE
Former [2011/51]For all designated states
ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH
Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15
44141 Dortmund / DE
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
Uhde GmbH
Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15
44141 Dortmund / DE
Inventor(s)01 / KOWOLL, Johannes
Stiepeler Strasse 67g
44799 Bochum / DE
02 / KUSKE, Eberhard
Balhorngasse 3
59494 Soest / DE
03 / ABRAHAM, Ralf
Lessingstrasse 66
59192 Bergkamen / DE
04 / HEINRITZ-ADRIAN, Max
Merschkamp 54
48155 Münster / DE
 [2010/22]
Representative(s)Brosch, Oliver , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date08802361.918.09.2008
[2010/22]
WO2008EP07841
Priority number, dateDE2007104472618.09.2007         Original published format: DE102007044726
DE2008101273405.03.2008         Original published format: DE102008012734
[2010/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009036985
Date:26.03.2009
Language:DE
[2009/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2190954
Date:02.06.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2009
[2010/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:C10J3/48, C10J3/52, C10J3/84
[2010/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/22]
TitleGerman:VERGASUNGSREAKTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR FLUGSTROMVERGASUNG[2010/22]
English:GASIFICATION REACTOR AND METHOD FOR ENTRAINED-FLOW GASIFICATION[2010/22]
French:RÉACTEUR DE GAZÉIFICATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE GAZÉIFICATION À LIT ENTRAÎNÉ[2010/22]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2010National basic fee paid 
16.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.07.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/22]
05.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination04.10.2016Appeal received No.  T0444/17
13.12.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.02.2017Interlocutory revision of appeal
10.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[XY]US4474584  (KOOG WOLFGANG [US]) [X] 1-5,7,9,13 * column 1, lines 5-9,60,61 * * column 2, lines 1-6,16-40 * * column 3, lines 21-26,56-62 * * column 6, lines 27-29 * * figure 1 * * claim 1 * [Y] 6,8,14,15,18-26;
 [XY]EP1097984  (KRC UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,16,17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0012] , [0014] , [0015] * * figures 1,4,5 * * claims 1,3-5,11,12 * [Y] 6,8,14,15,18-26;
 [Y]DE4025916  (DEUTSCHES BRENNSTOFFINST [DE]) [Y] 14,15,18-26 * column 1 * * column 3, lines 1-24 *;
 [Y]WO2005052095  (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [Y] 6,14,15,18-26 * page 1, lines 13-25 * * page 5, lines 3-8 * * page 6, lines 31,32 * * page 7, lines 5-8,17-19 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4230124  (BABCOCK ENERGIE UMWELT [DE]) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2004256657  (UBE INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-26 * abstract *;
 [A]US3841061  (PIKE D) [A] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE102006031816  (SIEMENS FUEL GASIFICATION TECH [DE], et al) [PX] 1-26 * the whole document *
by applicantUS3963457
 EP0400740
 US4936871
 US5441547
 US4950308
 US4247302
 US4494963
 EP0278063
 EP0374324
 US4992081
 US5744067
 DE4001739
 WO9845388
 DE102005048488
 DE102005041930
 DE102005041931
 DE19751889
 EP0084343
 US2007062117
 DE19718131