Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2197656 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2197656



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1567
15.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.10.2018 Description Opposition 14
15.10.2018 English translation of the claims Opposition 3
15.10.2018 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
15.10.2018 French translation of claims Opposition 3
15.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
23.07.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
23.07.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 3
23.07.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
23.07.2018 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 30
15.06.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
13.06.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
07.02.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
11.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
09.01.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
08.01.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
08.01.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 35
04.01.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.01.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
04.01.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2017 General enquiry Appeal 1
14.09.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.09.2017 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.09.2017 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 5
14.09.2017 F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) Appeal 29
03.07.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 29
03.07.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 29
03.07.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.07.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
30.06.2017 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
29.06.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
08.06.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
31.05.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
23.05.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
18.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
16.05.2017 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
02.02.2017 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
27.01.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
19.01.2017 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
09.12.2016 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 1
09.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
09.12.2016 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
02.12.2016 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
05.01.2016 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.12.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
04.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
04.12.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
04.12.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 2
04.12.2015 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
01.12.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 8
07.10.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.09.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
15.09.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.09.2015 Request for change of name - applicant Appeal 29
09.09.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
09.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
09.09.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
09.09.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.08.2015 Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure Appeal 14
26.06.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
22.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
22.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.06.2015 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
12.02.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.02.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.02.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
05.02.2015 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 51
05.02.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 5
05.02.2015 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 24
05.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 28
03.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
03.02.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 15
15.01.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
14.01.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
14.01.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
12.01.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
17.12.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.12.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.12.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
12.12.2014 Reply to appeal Appeal 10
05.12.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
05.12.2014 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
28.11.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
28.11.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
26.11.2014 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
26.08.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
26.08.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
21.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
21.08.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
20.08.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 6
20.08.2014 Claims Appeal 3
20.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
20.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
20.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
20.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
20.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
20.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
20.08.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 43
19.08.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
16.08.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.08.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
16.08.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 9
06.08.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
06.08.2014 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
10.07.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.07.2014 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.07.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
18.06.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
18.06.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
12.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
12.06.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
12.06.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
10.06.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
10.06.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.05.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
26.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.05.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
22.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
22.05.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
21.05.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
15.05.2014 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 3
13.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.05.2014 Request for change of name -opponent Opposition 4
09.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.04.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
16.04.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 6
16.04.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
16.04.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 24
16.04.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
16.04.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.04.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
16.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
16.04.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
16.04.2014 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 46
16.04.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.04.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 18
04.04.2014 General enquiry Opposition 1
13.02.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 24
04.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.02.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 5
03.02.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
03.02.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
03.02.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
03.02.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
24.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.01.2014 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
10.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.01.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.01.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
07.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
07.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
06.01.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
06.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
06.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.01.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 16
06.01.2014 Claims Opposition 5
06.01.2014 Claims Opposition 5
06.01.2014 Claims Opposition 6
06.01.2014 Claims Opposition 6
06.01.2014 Claims Opposition 5
06.01.2014 Claims Opposition 5
06.01.2014 Claims Opposition 5
06.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
06.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 21
02.01.2014 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
02.01.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.01.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
02.01.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
28.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
28.11.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.11.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
21.11.2013 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.11.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.10.2013 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
30.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
24.10.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
14.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
11.10.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.10.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
03.10.2013 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 13
24.09.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
24.09.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
24.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.09.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.09.2013 Communication of amended entries Opposition 1
06.09.2013 Authorisation of representative Opposition 3
05.09.2013 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 2
18.04.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
10.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 32
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
10.04.2013 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
10.04.2013 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
09.04.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
09.04.2013 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 11
05.11.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
30.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
30.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
30.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
30.10.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
26.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
26.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
26.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
26.10.2012 Claims Opposition 5
26.10.2012 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
28.06.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.06.2012 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
25.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.05.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
22.05.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.05.2012 Request for documents Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
11.05.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 5
11.05.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 13
11.05.2012 Non-scannable object Opposition 2
11.05.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
11.05.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
11.05.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
11.05.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
07.05.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.05.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
07.05.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
07.05.2012 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
28.07.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
01.07.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 8
01.07.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
01.07.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
04.03.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
04.03.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.03.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.03.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 51
29.05.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
27.05.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.05.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
16.04.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
23.02.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
12.02.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
17.11.2009 Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) Search / examination 1
12.11.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.11.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
12.11.2009 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
03.09.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
02.09.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
02.09.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
02.09.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
13.07.2009 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
13.07.2009 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
13.07.2009 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
28.04.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
09.04.2009 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 53
04.12.2008 Document concerning representation PCT receiving Office 1
26.09.2008 Abstract PCT receiving Office 5
26.09.2008 Claims PCT receiving Office 5
26.09.2008 Description PCT receiving Office 39
26.09.2008 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3