Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2203912

EP2203912 - SEPARATING DEVICE HAVING AN ENERGY STORAGE FOR AN ENERGY-CONDUCTING ELECTRIC LEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.06.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 04.07.2018  [2018/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Schweiz AG
Freilagerstrasse 40
8047 Zürich / CH
[2015/04]
Former [2013/11]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Former [2010/27]For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHERMANN, Harald
Kornweg 3a
82282 Unterschweinbach / DE
02 / SCHREYER, Karlheinz
Gartenstr. 6
82515 Wolfratshausen / DE
 [2010/27]
Representative(s)Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date08803225.526.08.2008
[2010/27]
WO2008EP61157
Priority number, dateEP2007011868817.10.2007         Original published format: EP 07118688
[2010/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009049949
Date:23.04.2009
Language:DE
[2009/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2203912
Date:07.07.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009
[2010/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2203912
Date:20.07.2011
Language:DE
[2011/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:G08B25/04, G08B25/00
[2010/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/27]
TitleGerman:TRENNVORRICHTUNG MIT ENERGIESPEICHER FÜR ENERGIEFÜHRENDE ELEKTRISCHE LEITUNG[2011/12]
English:SEPARATING DEVICE HAVING AN ENERGY STORAGE FOR AN ENERGY-CONDUCTING ELECTRIC LEAD[2010/27]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION ÉQUIPÉ D'UN COLLECTEUR D'ÉNERGIE POUR UNE LIGNE ÉLECTRIQUE ACHEMINANT DE L'ÉNERGIE[2010/27]
Former [2010/27]TRENNVORRICHTUNG MIT ENERGIESPEICHER FÜR ENERGIE FÜHRENDE ELEKTRISCHE LEITUNG
Entry into regional phase10.03.2010National basic fee paid 
10.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/27]
08.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2011Fee for grant paid
06.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.02.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.04.2012  07.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Novar GmbH
Dieselstrasse 2
41469 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/27]
Opponent(s)01  18.04.2012  07.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Novar GmbH
Dieselstrasse 2
41469 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Former [2018/17]
Opponent(s)01  18.04.2012  07.05.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Novar GmbH
Dieselstrasse 2
41469 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
DE-80333 München / DE
Former [2012/21]
Opponent(s)01  18.04.2012   
Novar GmbH
Dieselstrasse 2
41469 Neuss / DE
Opponent's representative
Wenning, Ekkehard
Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
30.05.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.10.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
21.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
21.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition13.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1187/16
29.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
HU20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
LU26.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
FR20.09.2011
BG20.10.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
AT26.08.2013
[2014/51]
Former [2013/45]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
HU20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
LU26.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
FR20.09.2011
BG20.10.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2013/44]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
TR20.07.2011
LU26.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
FR20.09.2011
BG20.10.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2013/29]CY20.07.2011
CZ20.07.2011
DK20.07.2011
EE20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
IT20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
RO20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
SK20.07.2011
LU26.08.2011
BE31.08.2011
MC31.08.2011
FR20.09.2011
BG20.10.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
ES31.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/20]CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
IE20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
MC31.08.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/18]CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
MC31.08.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/13]CY20.07.2011
FI20.07.2011
HR20.07.2011
LT20.07.2011
LV20.07.2011
MT20.07.2011
PL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
SI20.07.2011
NO20.10.2011
GR21.10.2011
IS20.11.2011
PT21.11.2011
Former [2012/05]MT20.07.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]DE19960422  (JOB LIZENZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-17 * column 6, line 48 - line 66 * * column 7, lines 26-29 * * column 8, lines 37-66 * * figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US4864519  (APPLEBY DAVID [GB] ET AL) [X] 1-17 * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 68 * * column 5, line 49 - line 57 * * column 11, line 23 - line 41 * * column 12, line 11 - line 41 * * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US5801913  (PITTEL ARKADY [US]) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 21; figures 1,2 *