Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2195407

EP2195407 - IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO FABRIC TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  11.02.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House
100 Victoria Embankment
London
EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/24]For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London
EC4Y 0DY / GB
For:AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  SE  SI  SK  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
Inventor(s)01 / MOHAMMADI, Mansur, Sultan
28 Halsall Green Spital
Wirral Merseyside CH63 9NA / GB
 [2010/31]
Former [2010/24]01 / MOHAMMADI, Mansur, Sultan
Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington
Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/24]Chisem, Janet
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Application number, filing date08804202.315.09.2008
[2010/24]
WO2008EP62242
Priority number, dateGB2007001916101.10.2007         Original published format: GB 0719161
[2010/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009043709
Date:09.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2195407
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009
[2010/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2195407
Date:16.03.2011
Language:EN
[2011/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/38, C11D3/386, A61Q19/00
[2010/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/24]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERUNGEN IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT TEXTILBEHANDLUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2010/24]
English:IMPROVEMENTS RELATING TO FABRIC TREATMENT COMPOSITIONS[2010/24]
French:AMÉLIORATIONS APPORTÉES AUX COMPOSITIONS DE TRAITEMENT DE TISSUS[2010/24]
Entry into regional phase12.03.2010National basic fee paid 
12.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
12.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/24]
06.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.01.2011Fee for grant paid
27.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.12.2011  22.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  16.12.2011  10.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
 [2018/18]
Former [2016/42]
Opponent(s)01  13.12.2011  22.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  16.12.2011  10.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Samuels, Lucy Alice, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2016/36]
Opponent(s)01  13.12.2011  22.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  16.12.2011  10.01.2012  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Kohol, Sonia, et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2012/04]
Opponent(s)01  13.12.2011  22.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  16.12.2011    ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Clemo, Nicholas Graham
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park - Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Former [2012/03]
Opponent(s)01  13.12.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
24.01.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
27.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
27.10.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition05.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0084/17
06.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
HU16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
MT16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
IE15.09.2011
LU15.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
PL15.09.2014
[2016/10]
Former [2013/45]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
HU16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
MT16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
IE15.09.2011
LU15.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
Former [2013/33]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
DK16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
MT16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
IE15.09.2011
LU15.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
CH30.09.2012
LI30.09.2012
Former [2012/02]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
NL16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2011/50]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
IS16.07.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2011/49]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
CZ16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
RO16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
SK16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2011/47]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
EE16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
PT18.07.2011
Former [2011/41]AT16.03.2011
BE16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
Former [2011/38]AT16.03.2011
CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
Former [2011/37]CY16.03.2011
FI16.03.2011
HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
SI16.03.2011
BG16.06.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
Former [2011/36]HR16.03.2011
LT16.03.2011
LV16.03.2011
SE16.03.2011
NO16.06.2011
GR17.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[AX]US2006177429  (FARMER SEAN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0096] , [0082] , [0084] , [0099] , [0102] , [0105] , [0114] , [0101] , [0120] , [0122] * * the whole document * [X] 14,15