Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2203774

EP2203774 - ARRANGEMENT FOR ANALYZING MICROSCOPIC AND MACROSCOPIC PREPARATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.08.2015
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 16.09.2015  [2015/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH
CPTD
Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/27]For all designated states
Leica Microsystems CMS GmbH
Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SENDROWSKI, Peter
Theodor-Heuss-Str. 102
69181 Leimen / DE
02 / KRESS, Claus
Peter-Schnellbach-Str. 35/3
69151Neckargmünd / DE
 [2010/27]
Representative(s)Hassenbürger, Anneliese , et al
Leica Microsystems GmbH
Corporate Patents + Trademarks Department
Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/27]Hassenbürger, Anneliese , et al
Leica Microsystems GmbH Corporate Patents + Trademarks Department Ernst-Leitz-Strasse 17-37
35578 Wetzlar / DE
Application number, filing date08804658.624.09.2008
[2010/27]
WO2008EP62749
Priority number, dateDE2007104808905.10.2007         Original published format: DE102007048089
[2010/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009047117
Date:16.04.2009
Language:DE
[2009/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2203774
Date:07.07.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009
[2010/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/00
[2010/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/27]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUM UNTERSUCHEN VON MIKROSKOPISCHEN UND MAKROSKOPISCHEN PRÄPARATEN[2010/27]
English:ARRANGEMENT FOR ANALYZING MICROSCOPIC AND MACROSCOPIC PREPARATIONS[2010/27]
French:SYSTÈME D'EXAMEN DE PRÉPARATIONS MICROSCOPIQUES OU MACROSCOPIQUES[2010/27]
Entry into regional phase06.05.2010National basic fee paid 
06.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
06.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/27]
06.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/38]
13.05.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/38]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.10.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]DE102004034992  (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-11 * paragraphs [0074] , [0075] * * figure 11 *;
 [A]DE102004051356  (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 4 * Zusammenfassung *;
 [A]JPS56151912  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 6,7 * Zusammenfassung *;
 [A]DE10344294  (EVOTEC TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [A] 6,7 * Zusammenfassung *;
 [A]JP2005017657  (HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS KK) [A] 6,7 * Zusammenfassung *;
 [A]US7138640  (DELGADO GIL [US], et al) [A] 6,7 * Zusammenfassung *
 [X]  - DIXON A E ET AL, "A NEW CONFOCAL SCANNING BEAM LASER MACROSCOPE USING A TELECENTRIC, F-THETA LASER SCAN LENS", JOURNAL OF MICROSCOPY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (19950601), vol. 178, no. PART 03, ISSN 0022-2720, pages 261 - 266, XP000197966 [X] 1-11 * page 263 - page 264 *