Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2215082

EP2215082 - PHTHALAZINE AND PYRIDO[3,4-D]PYRIDAZINE COMPOUNDS AS H1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/32]PHTHALAZINE AND PYRIDO Ý3,4-D PYRIDAZ INE COMPOUNDS AS H1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS
[2011/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.2012
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Glaxo Group Limited
Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex
UB6 0NN / GB
[2010/32]
Inventor(s)01 / GORE, Paul, Martin
GlaxoSmithKline
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
02 / LOOKER, Brian, Edgar
GlaxoSmithKline
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
03 / PROCOPIOU, Panayiotis, Alexandrou
GlaxoSmithKline
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
04 / VILE, Sadie
GlaxoSmithKline
Gunnels Wood Road
Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
 [2011/38]
Former [2010/32]01 / GORE, Paul, Martin
GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
02 / LOOKER, Brian, Edgar
GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
03 / PROCOPIOU, Panayiotis, Alexandrou
GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
04 / VILE, Sadie
GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage
Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB
Representative(s)Le Mière, Jennifer Louise , et al
GlaxoSmithKline
Global Patents (CN925.1)
980 Great West Road
Bentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/32]Le Mière, Jennifer Louise , et al
GlaxoSmithKline Services Unlimited Corporate Intellectual Property 980 Great West Road
GB-Bentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB
Application number, filing date08805231.110.10.2008
[2010/32]
WO2008EP63642
Priority number, dateUS20070979105P11.10.2007         Original published format: US 979105 P
[2010/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009047336
Date:16.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2215082
Date:11.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2009
[2010/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2215082
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07D403/06, C07D471/04, A61K31/502, A61K31/5025, A61P29/00, A61P37/08
[2010/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/32]
TitleGerman:PHTHALAZIN- UND PYRIDO[3,4-D]PYRIDAZINVERBINDUNGEN ALS H1-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN[2010/32]
English:PHTHALAZINE AND PYRIDO[3,4-D]PYRIDAZINE COMPOUNDS AS H1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS[2011/18]
French:PHTHALAZINE ET COMPOSÉS PYRIDO[3,4-D]PYRIDAZINE COMME ANTAGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR H1[2011/18]
Former [2010/32]PHTHALAZINE AND PYRIDO Ý3,4-D PYRIDAZ INE COMPOUNDS AS H1 RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS
Former [2010/32]PHTHALAZINE ET COMPOSÉS PYRIDO-Ý3,4-D PYRIDAZINE COMME ANTAGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR H1
Entry into regional phase07.05.2010National basic fee paid 
07.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
07.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/32]
22.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.2011Fee for grant paid
28.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.04.2011
Opposition(s)22.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
IE10.10.2011
LU10.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
IE10.10.2011
LU10.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2013/29]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
IE10.10.2011
LU10.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2013/25]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
IE10.10.2011
LU10.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2013/14]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
IE10.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/47]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
IE10.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/35]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/26]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/24]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
Former [2012/13]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[DA]DE3634942  (ASTA WERKE AG CHEM FAB [DE]) [DA] 1,10,15,19,21 * page 5, lines 26-35; claim 1 *