Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2206419

EP2206419 - PRODUCT PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.07.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novalia Ltd
The Quorum Barnwell Road Cambridge
Cambridgeshire CB5 8RE / GB
[2010/28]
Inventor(s)01 / STONE, Kate
7 Prince William Court Victoria Road
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 3NL / GB
 [2010/28]
Representative(s)Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
Byron House
Cambridge Business Park
Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/10]Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road
Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB
Former [2010/28]Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej , et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date08806763.217.10.2008
[2010/28]
WO2008GB50949
Priority number, dateGB2007002039118.10.2007         Original published format: GB 0720391
[2010/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009050515
Date:23.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2206419
Date:14.07.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009
[2010/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/00, H05K1/02, H05K1/03, H05K1/11, H05K3/00, H05K3/12, H05K3/32, H05K3/36
[2013/40]
Former International [2010/28]H05K1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/28]
TitleGerman:PRODUKTVERPACKUNG[2010/28]
English:PRODUCT PACKAGING[2010/28]
French:EMBALLAGE DE PRODUIT[2010/28]
Entry into regional phase28.04.2010National basic fee paid 
28.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
28.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/28]
05.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.03.2015
17.03.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
09.04.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination15.06.2015Appeal received No.  T2129/15
19.08.2015Statement of grounds filed
27.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.06.2014Request for further processing filed
30.06.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.07.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
29.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
24.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
18.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
20.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
18.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201912   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]DE102004005370  (SAMSUNG SDI CO [KR]) [X] 1,7,12,13,15-18,21,23-31,34 * paragraphs [0028] - [0037]; figures 1-9 *;
 [X]US2005274541  (TAKAHASHI NORIO [JP]) [X] 1,5,7,9,14,18,19,21,22,24,30-32 * page 1, paragraph 24 - page 2, paragraph 35; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]JPH07283493  (NIPPON CHEMICON) [X] 1,7,18,21,24,31 * abstract *;
 [X]US6143991  (MORIYAMA YOSHIFUMI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,11,16-18,20,24,25,28,30-34 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 54; figures 1-7 *
by applicantDE102004005370