Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2150140

EP2150140 - PATTERNED WRAPPER PAPER WITH AN ANTI-WRINKLING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.10.2014
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip31.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2014  [2014/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchâtel / CH
[2010/06]
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Ping
5525 Summer Creek Way
Glen Allen, VA 23059 / US
02 / YANG, Szu-Sung
2831 Cove View Lane
Midlothian, Virginia 23112 / US
03 / BAREN, Randall, Eugene
11412 Sutton Park Court
Glen Allen, VA 23059 / US
 [2010/06]
Representative(s)Marlow, Nicholas Simon
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/06]Marlow, Nicholas Simon
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date08807083.423.05.2008
[2010/06]
WO2008IB02399
Priority number, dateUS20070924666P24.05.2007         Original published format: US 924666 P
US20070924676P25.05.2007         Original published format: US 924676 P
US20070924825P01.06.2007         Original published format: US 924825 P
US20070929452P28.06.2007         Original published format: US 929452 P
US20070935751P29.08.2007         Original published format: US 935751 P
US2008006443805.03.2008         Original published format: US 64438
[2010/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009004482
Date:08.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2150140
Date:10.02.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009
[2010/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:A24D1/02
[2010/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/06]
TitleGerman:STRUKTURIERTES WICKELPAPIER MIT EINEM ANTIKNITTERUNGSMITTEL[2010/06]
English:PATTERNED WRAPPER PAPER WITH AN ANTI-WRINKLING AGENT[2010/06]
French:PAPIER D'EMBALLAGE À MOTIFS AVEC AGENT ANTI-PLISSEMENT[2010/06]
Entry into regional phase11.12.2009National basic fee paid 
11.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
11.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/06]
28.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/49]
07.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2014/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]US2005076929  (FITZGERALD JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-14,17-25 * paragraph [0226] - paragraph [0268]; figure - *;
 [X]US2005016556  (ASHCRAFT CHARLES RAY [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,13,17-25 * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0169]; figure - *;
 [X]WO2007020532  (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,3,8,17-22,24,25 * page 1, line 14 - page 13, line 36; figure -; claim - *;
 [X]WO2007031965  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 22,23 * page 11, line 17 - page 13, line 23 * * page 20, line 5 - line 10 *;
 [A]CA952656  (SCOTT PAPER CO) [A] 22-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0671505  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1,19,22,25 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2005076929