Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2192949

EP2192949 - RETURN ELECTRODE FOR A FLEXIBLE CIRCUIT ELECTRODE ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2012
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.12.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Second Sight Medical Products, Inc.
12744 San Fernando Road
Building 3
Sylmar, CA 91342 / US
[N/P]
Former [2010/23]For all designated states
Second Sight Medical Products, Inc.
12744 San Fernando Road Building 3
Sylmar, CA 91342 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GREENBERG, Robert, J.
2431 Wild Oak Drive
Los Angeles, CA 90068 / US
02 / NEYSMITH, Jordan, Matthew
350 S. Oakland Avenue, 107
Pasadena, CA 91101 / US
03 / TALBOT, Neil, Hamilton
4634 Melanie Lane
La Crescenta, CA 91214 / US
04 / LITTLE, James, Singleton
21674 Agajanian Lane
Saugus, CA 91350 / US
05 / MCCLURE, Kelly, H.
7199 Santa Susana Pass Road
Simi Valley, CA 93063 / US
06 / MECH, Brian, V.
24575 Town Center Drive, 2309
Valencia, CA 91355 / US
07 / DAI, Rongqing
23335 Landmark Way
Valencia, CA 91354 / US
08 / ZHOU, David, Daomin
29042 N. Discovery Ridge Drive
Saugus, CA 91390 / US
09 / NOLAN, Gaillard, R.
4260 Windrush Road
Oxford, MD 21643 / US
 [2010/23]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/23]Carter, Stephen John , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Application number, filing date08826093.007.07.2008
[2010/23]
WO2008US69348
Priority number, dateUS20070948166P05.07.2007         Original published format: US 948166 P
US20070968014P24.08.2007         Original published format: US 968014 P
US20070973230P18.09.2007         Original published format: US 973230 P
US20070977929P05.10.2007         Original published format: US 977929 P
[2010/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009006636
Date:08.01.2009
Language:EN
[2009/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2192949
Date:09.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2009
[2010/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2192949
Date:05.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/36, A61N1/05
[2010/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/23]
TitleGerman:NEUTRALELEKTRODE FÜR ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG EINER FLEXIBLEN SCHALTUNG[2010/23]
English:RETURN ELECTRODE FOR A FLEXIBLE CIRCUIT ELECTRODE ARRAY[2010/23]
French:ELECTRODE DE RETOUR POUR UN RÉ SEAU D'ÉLECTRODES DE CIRCUIT FLEXIBLE[2010/23]
Entry into regional phase04.02.2010National basic fee paid 
04.02.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
04.02.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.02.2010Examination requested  [2010/23]
27.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.06.2012Fee for grant paid
19.06.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.11.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  31.05.2013   
Pixium Vision SA
Institut de la Vision
13, rue Moreau
75012 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al
Graf von Stosch
Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Prinzregentenstraße 22
80538 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/28]
Opponent(s)01  31.05.2013   
Pixium Vision SA
Institut de la Vision
13, rue Moreau
75012 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al
Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22
80538 München / DE
12.07.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.01.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.04.2015Date of oral proceedings
18.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
18.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition26.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1708/15
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.07.2008
AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE07.07.2013
LU07.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
MT05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
TR05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE07.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/33]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
IE07.07.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/20]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
CH31.07.2013
LI31.07.2013
Former [2014/14]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
MC05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/46]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
ES16.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/37]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
IT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
DK05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
BG05.12.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/28]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
PT07.01.2013
Former [2013/23]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
PL05.09.2012
RO05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
SK05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
Former [2013/22]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
CZ05.09.2012
EE05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
NL05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
IS05.01.2013
Former [2013/20]AT05.09.2012
BE05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/12]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
SE05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/11]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
LV05.09.2012
SI05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
GR06.12.2012
Former [2013/10]AT05.09.2012
CY05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
HR05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Former [2013/09]AT05.09.2012
FI05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Former [2013/08]AT05.09.2012
LT05.09.2012
NO05.12.2012
Former [2013/07]AT05.09.2012
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2006142857  (CHOW ALAN Y [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9,10,12,14,18,24,26 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0025] , [0031] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] * [Y] 4,5,13,15,16,19,21-23;
 [Y]EP1762269  (SECOND SIGHT MEDICAL PROD INC [US]) [Y] 4,5,13,21-23 * abstract * * paragraphs [0066] , [0090] - [0092] *;
 [XA]WO2006119468  (SECOND SIGHT MEDICAL PROD INC [US]; GREENBERG ROBERT JAY [US]; HUMAYUN) [X] 1,6-9,11,20,24-26 * abstract * * page 7, lines 4-18 * * page 8, lines 24-27 * * page 9, line 26 * [A] 17;
 [Y]US2004054407  (TASHIRO HIROYUKI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 16 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] *;
 [YA]US2005004625  (CHOW ALAN Y [US]) [Y] 19 * paragraph [0065] * [A] 17
 [Y]  - TALUKDER, M.I.; SIY, P.; AUNER, G.W., "Design of Return/Ground Electrode for Neural Stimulator", BIOENGINEERING CONFERENCE, 2006. PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE 32ND ANNUAL NORTHEAST, (20060515), XP002508511 [Y] 15 * figure 3c *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NEBC.2006.1629775