Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2171479

EP2171479 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE DIRECTION OF ROTATION OF A WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  29.07.2016
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.07.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 31.08.2016  [2016/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 Quai Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[2010/14]
Inventor(s)01 / ANDRIEUX, Arnaud
6 rue du Générale Daullé
F-62140 Hesdin / FR
02 / CHABANON, Christian
10 Avenue Descartes
F-78180 Montigny Le Bretonneux / FR
03 / LENGELLE, Régis
7 rue Michot
F-10440 Torvilliers / FR
04 / BEAUSEROY, Pierre
11 rue Dominique Bâtiment A
F-10000 Troyes / FR
 [2010/14]
Representative(s)Alizon, Robert
Renault s.a.s.
TCR GRA 2 36
1, avenue du Golf
78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/14]Alizon, Robert
Renault s.a.s. TCR GRA 2 36 1, avenue du Golf
F-78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date08826591.311.07.2008
[2010/14]
WO2008FR51311
Priority number, dateFR2007005645212.07.2007         Original published format: FR 0756452
[2010/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009013424
Date:29.01.2009
Language:FR
[2009/05]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2171479
Date:07.04.2010
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2009
[2010/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:G01P3/481, G01P3/489, G01P21/02
[2010/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/14]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER DREHRICHTUNG EINES RADES[2010/14]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE DIRECTION OF ROTATION OF A WHEEL[2010/14]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETERMINATION DU SENS DE ROTATION D'UNE ROUE[2010/14]
Entry into regional phase03.12.2009National basic fee paid 
03.12.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
03.12.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.12.2009Examination requested  [2010/14]
07.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2016/35]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0008475  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; BOCK STEFAN [AT]; KOESTLER WERNER [AT]; REDELBERGER H) [X] 1-11 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 3 * * page 5, line 17 - page 6, line 30; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO9910747  (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]; HEINRICHS BARTSCHER SASCHA [DE]; LANDSIEDEL TH) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19847328  (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6204658  (STANUSCH GERALD [DE] ET AL) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *