Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2140619

EP2140619 - COMBINED WIRED AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS WITH FIELD DEVICES IN A PROCESS CONTROL ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fieldcomm Group, Inc.
9430 Research Blvd., Suite 1-120
Austin, Texas 78759 / US
[2017/33]
Former [2010/01]For all designated states
Hart Communication Foundation
9390 Research Blvd.,Suite I-350
Austin, TX 78759 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PRATT, Wallace, A.
P.O. Box 939
Pflugerville, TX 78691 / US
02 / NIXON, Mark, J.
1503 Blackjack Drive
Round Rock, TX 78681 / US
03 / ROTVOLD, Eric, D.
8450 Ann Marie Trail
Inner Grove Heights, MN 55077 / US
04 / PRAMANIK, Robin, S.
Moninger Strasse 17
76135 Karlsruhe / DE
05 / LENNVALL, Tomas, P.
Skallbergsgatan 12A
72221 Vasteras / SE
 [2010/01]
Representative(s)Studio Torta S.p.A.
Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
[2018/23]
Former [2010/01]Franzolin, Luigi , et al
Studio Torta S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9
10121 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date08826678.811.04.2008
[2010/01]
WO2008US04750
Priority number, dateUS20070911795P13.04.2007         Original published format: US 911795 P
US2008010098610.04.2008         Original published format: US 100986
[2010/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009017521
Date:05.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2140619
Date:06.01.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2009
[2010/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2140619
Date:06.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR25.06.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.06.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28, // H04W84/18
[2018/01]
Former International [2010/01]H04L12/28, H04L12/66
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/23]
Former [2010/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMBINIERTE KABELUNTERSTÜTZTE UND KABELLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONEN MIT FELDGERÄTEN IN EINER PROZESSSTEUERUNGSUMGEBUNG[2010/01]
English:COMBINED WIRED AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS WITH FIELD DEVICES IN A PROCESS CONTROL ENVIRONMENT[2010/01]
French:COMMUNICATIONS CÂBLÉES ET SANS FIL COMBINÉES AVEC DES DISPOSITIFS DE CHAMP DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE COMMANDE DE PROCÉDÉ[2010/01]
Entry into regional phase10.11.2009National basic fee paid 
10.11.2009Search fee paid 
10.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
10.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.11.2009Examination requested  [2010/01]
13.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2018Fee for grant paid
24.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.11.2012
Opposition(s)07.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
IT06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
[2019/11]
Former [2019/10]AT06.06.2018
CY06.06.2018
CZ06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
PL06.06.2018
RO06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
SK06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/09]CY06.06.2018
EE06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/08]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
IS06.10.2018
Former [2019/03]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
NL06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/52]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
GR07.09.2018
Former [2018/51]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
LV06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/50]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
HR06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/49]CY06.06.2018
ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
SE06.06.2018
BG06.09.2018
NO06.09.2018
Former [2018/47]ES06.06.2018
FI06.06.2018
LT06.06.2018
NO06.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006121114  (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [E]US2009097502  (YAMAMOTO SHUJI [JP]) [E] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 61 - page 4, paragraph 100 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US2005164684  (CHEN DEJI [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 22 - page 3, paragraph 27 * * page 10, paragraph 74 - page 14, paragraph 99 * * figures 1,15 *;
 [X]WO0205199  (METSO FIELD SYSTEMS OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 5, paragraph 14 - page 7, paragraph 17 * * page 9, paragraph 21 - page 12, paragraph 24 * * figures 1,2,4 *;
 [A]US2005125085  (PRASAD RAGHAVENDRA T [IN], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, paragraph 28 - page 3, paragraph 38 * * page 4, paragraph 58 - page 5, paragraph 69 * * page 5, paragraph 79 - page 6, paragraph 86 * * figures 1,3,4,6 *;
 [A]  - EGEA-LOPEZ E ET AL, "Wireless communications deployment in industry: a review of issues, options and technologies", COMPUTERS IN INDUSTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.COMPIND.2004.10.001, (20050101), vol. 56, no. 1, ISSN 0166-3615, pages 29 - 53, XP004698985 [A] 1-12 * page 31, chapter "3. Communication systems in industry" * * page 46, chapter "5. Applications of wireless systems in industry" * * figures 1,5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compind.2004.10.001
 [A]  - XINGFA SHEN ET AL, "Wireless sensor networks for industrial applications", INTELLIGENT CONTROL AND AUTOMATION, 2004. WCICA 2004. FIFTH WORLD CONG RESS ON HANGZHOU, CHINA 15-19 JUNE 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/WCICA.2004.1343273, (20040615), vol. 4, ISBN 978-0-7803-8273-2, pages 3636 - 3640, XP010730920 [A] 1-12 * page 3636, chapter "II. Industrial Automation" * * page 3637, chapter "IV. Design and Implementation" * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCICA.2004.1343273
 [A]  - PULAT MATKURBANOV ET AL, "A Survey and Analysis of Wireless Fieldbus for Industrial Environments", SICE-ICCAS 2006 INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20061001), ISBN 978-89-950038-4-8, pages 5555 - 5561, XP031050535 [A] 1-12 * page 5556, chapter "3. Analysis of Wireless Fieldbus Technology" * * page 5557, chapter "4. Hybrid Network Protocols for Industrial Environment" * * page 5558, chapter "5. Practical Test in Industrial Environment" * * figures 1-7 *
International search[A]US2006077917  (BRAHMAJOSYULA JAGADEESH [IN], et al);
 [A]US2005228509  (JAMES ROBERT [US]);
 [A]US2002120671  (DAFFNER KLAUS-JOSEF [DE], et al);
 [A]US2004259533  (NIXON MARK [US], et al)