Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2190522

EP2190522 - STIMULATION FIELD MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.10.2013
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.11.2013  [2013/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway N.E.
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
[2010/22]
Inventor(s)01 / EGGEN, Michael, D.
5250 Keats Avenue N.
Lake Elmo, MN 55042 / US
02 / SOMMER, John, L.
12788 Ibis Street NW
Coon Rapids, MN 55448 / US
03 / EBERT, Michael
1525 Berne Circle W.
Fridley, MN 55421 / US
04 / BOURN, David, Wayne
11750 Tulip Street NW Apt. 323
Coon Rapids, MN 55433 / US
05 / MIYAZAWA, Gabriela, C.
1552 Woodside Court NE
Fridley, MN 55432 / US
 [2010/22]
Representative(s)Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/22]Hughes, Andrea Michelle
Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date08827755.320.08.2008
[2010/22]
WO2008US09924
Priority number, dateUS20070956832P20.08.2007         Original published format: US 956832 P
US20070956868P20.08.2007         Original published format: US 956868 P
US2008004924030.04.2008         Original published format: US 49240
[2010/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009025828
Date:26.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2190522
Date:02.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009
[2010/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05
[2010/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/22]
TitleGerman:STIMULATIONSFELD-MANAGEMENT[2010/22]
English:STIMULATION FIELD MANAGEMENT[2010/22]
French:GESTION DE CHAMP DE STIMULATION[2010/22]
Entry into regional phase10.03.2010National basic fee paid 
10.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
10.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/22]
25.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/46]
26.06.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/46]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201306   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0103767  (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]) [X] 1-8,13-15 * pages 5,6; figures 1,2C *;
 [X]US5755766  (CHASTAIN STUART R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,9,10,13-15 * columns 1,4; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US2004193240  (MICHEL ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-15 * figure 1 *;
 [PX]WO2008094879  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]; HUOTARI CRAIG T [US]; LESSAR JOSEPH F [US]; BREYEN) [PX] 11-14 * pages 3,7; figure 1 *