Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2198969

EP2198969 - BUCKET TYPE JAW CRUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
18.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ueda Industries Co., Ltd.
4-3-3 Sawaragi-nishi Ibaraki
Osaka 567-0868 / JP
[2010/25]
Inventor(s)01 / UEDA, Toshiharu
c/o UEDA INDUSTRIES CO. LTD.
4-3-3 Sawaragi-nishi
Ibaraki
Osaka 567-0868 / JP
 [2014/27]
Former [2010/25]01 / UEDA, Toshiharu
c/o UEDA INDUSTRIES CO. LTD. 4-3-3 Sawaragi-nishi Ibaraki
Osaka 567-0868 / JP
Representative(s)Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Kurfürstendamm 54/55
10707 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/27]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2010/25]Jackson, Martin Peter
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date08829092.903.09.2008
[2010/25]
WO2008JP02413
Priority number, dateJP2007022740403.09.2007         Original published format: JP 2007227404
[2010/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009031296
Date:12.03.2009
Language:JA
[2009/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2198969
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2198969
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP12.03.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2011
ClassificationInternational:B02C1/02, E02F3/36, E02F3/40
[2010/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/25]
TitleGerman:BACKENBRECHER MIT SCHAUFEL[2010/25]
English:BUCKET TYPE JAW CRUSHER[2010/25]
French:CONCASSEUR À MÂCHOIRES DE TYPE À GODET[2010/25]
Entry into regional phase18.03.2010Translation filed 
18.03.2010National basic fee paid 
18.03.2010Search fee paid 
18.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/25]
04.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2014Fee for grant paid
22.05.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.04.2015  09.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Meccanica Breganzese S.p.A. In Breve Mb S.p.A.
Via Astico, 30/A
36030 Fara Vicentino (VI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Locas, Davide
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18
35122 Padova / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2015/20]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2015  09.04.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Meccanica Breganzese S.p.A. In Breve Mb S.p.A.
Via Astico, 30/A
36030 Fara Vicentino (VI) / IT
Opponent's representative
Locas, Davide
Cantaluppi & Partners S.r.l.
Piazzetta Cappellato Pedrocchi, 18
35122 Padova / IT
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
07.05.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
14.09.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
08.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition17.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0437/17
18.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
06.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.09.2008
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
TR02.07.2014
IE03.09.2014
LU03.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU03.09.2008
AT02.07.2014
BE02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
IE03.09.2014
LU03.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2016/28]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
MT02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
IE03.09.2014
LU03.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/50]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SI02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
IE03.09.2014
LU03.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/37]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
IE03.09.2014
LU03.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
LU03.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
CH30.09.2014
LI30.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
LU03.09.2014
BE30.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/23]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
EE02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
SK02.07.2014
LU03.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
DK02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
RO02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
LU03.09.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/20]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
MC02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/12]AT02.07.2014
CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
HR02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
LV02.07.2014
NL02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
IS02.11.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/11]CY02.07.2014
CZ02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
PL02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
GR03.10.2014
PT03.11.2014
Former [2015/10]CZ02.07.2014
FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
BG02.10.2014
NO02.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI02.07.2014
LT02.07.2014
SE02.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT02.07.2014
Documents cited:Search[YA]US3075711  (PAUL KAUTZ HARRY) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 12 - line 20 * [A] 2-5;
 [YA]GB714240  (PARKER LTD FREDERICK; FREDERICK WILLIAM PARKER) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 72 - line 78; figure 1 * * page 3, line 3 - line 6; figures 2,4 * [A] 2-5;
 [A]GB222039  (HARRY AUGUST STOCKMAN) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 28 - line 43; figures 1,2 *
International search[Y]JPH08150344  (JIYAKUTEI ENG KK) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2001252586  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , Column 14, lines 30 to 39; column 17, lines 23 to 26 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPS50106172U  (Sekigahara Seisakusho, Ltd.) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , Fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2004167443  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1, 3-6 * , Fig. 1 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2005342610  (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY) [Y] 3 * , Par. No. [0024]; Fig. 9 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JP2007117931  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 4 * , Figs. 2, 8 (Family: none) *;
 [Y]JPH10137604  (NAKAYAMA TEKKOSHO KK) [Y] 5 * , Par. No. [0032]; Fig. 3 (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2003164769  (KOYO SANGYO CO) [A] 1-6 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH0821108  (YUTANI JUKO KK) [A] 1-6 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2007185567  (KURIMOTO LTD) [A] 2 * , Par. No. [0003] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH05131153  (NOODOBAAGU NIPPON KK) [A] 2 * , Full text; all drawings (Family: none) *
by applicantJPS63275825