Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2191956

EP2191956 - DEVICE AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVELY DEPOSITING MOLTEN PLASTIC MATERIAL AND PRODUCTION METHOD COMPRISING SELECTIVE DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fundació Eurecat
Parc Tecnològico del Vallès
Avenida Universitat Autònoma 23
08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès / ES
[2017/10]
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
Fundació Privada Ascamm
Av. Universitat Autònoma 23 08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès
Barcelona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / PLANTÀ TORRALBA, Francisco Xavier
Av. Universitat Autònoma 23
E-08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès
Barcelona / ES
02 / PULIGA, Francesco
Av. Universitat Autònoma 23
E-08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès
Barcelona / ES
03 / PALLARES BEJARANO, Alvaro
Av. Universitat Autònoma 23
E-08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès
Barcelona / ES
 [2017/43]
Former [2010/22]01 / PLANTÀ TORRALBA, Francisco Xavier
Av. Universitat Autònoma 23 E-08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès
Barcelona / ES
02 / PULIGA, Francesco
Av. Universitat Autònoma 23 E-08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès
Barcelona / ES
03 / PALLARES BEJARANO, Alvaro
Av. Universitat Autònoma 23 E-08290 Cerdanyola del Vallès
Barcelona / ES
Representative(s)Gislon, Gabriele
Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L.
C/Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669bis 1è 2º
08013 Barcelona / ES
[2017/43]
Former [2010/22]Gislon, Gabriele
Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669bis 1è 2º
08013 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date08829279.225.08.2008
[2010/22]
WO2008ES00570
Priority number, dateES2007000239004.09.2007         Original published format: ES 200702390
[2010/22]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009030791
Date:12.03.2009
Language:ES
[2009/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2191956
Date:02.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2191956
Date:25.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES12.03.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2013
ClassificationInternational:B29C67/00, G05B19/4099, B41J2/04
[2013/48]
Former International [2010/22]B29C67/00, G05B19/4099
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/43]
Former [2010/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND GERÄT ZUR GEZIELTEN ABLAGERUNG VON GESCHMOLZENEM KUNSTSTOFFMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN MIT GEZIELTER ABLAGERUNG[2010/22]
English:DEVICE AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVELY DEPOSITING MOLTEN PLASTIC MATERIAL AND PRODUCTION METHOD COMPRISING SELECTIVE DEPOSITION[2010/22]
French:DISPOSITIF ET APPAREIL DE DÉPÔT SÉLECTIF DE MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE FONDUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR DÉPÔT SÉLECTIF[2010/22]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2010Translation filed 
15.03.2010National basic fee paid 
15.03.2010Search fee paid 
15.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
15.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.07.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: ES
31.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/22]
09.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2017Fee for grant paid
15.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.03.2016
Opposition(s)26.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
04.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
01.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201306   M06   Fee paid on   22.10.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
MC25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
[2019/15]
Former [2018/52]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SI25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/42]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
RO25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
PL25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT25.10.2017
CY25.10.2017
DK25.10.2017
EE25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
SK25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
LV25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
BG25.01.2018
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT25.10.2017
ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
HR25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
SE25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
GR26.01.2018
IS25.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES25.10.2017
FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Former [2018/21]FI25.10.2017
LT25.10.2017
NO25.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6036467  (JAMESON LEE KIRBY [US]) [X] 1,7,8,11 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 18 - line 30 * * column 4, line 64 - column 7, line 54 * * example 4 * [I] 3-6,9,10,12-15;
 [XA]EP0833237  (STRATASYS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-15 * column 6, line 50 - column 9, line 57 * * column 18, line 36 - column 19, line 38 * * figure - * [A] 3-6,9;
 [X]WO2004024415  (DKI PLAST A S [DK], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * figure - * * claim - * * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 28 *;
 [XYI]US2002111707  (LI ZHIMIN [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10-15 * figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0071] * * claim - * [Y] 11-15 [I] 2-6,9;
 [XYI]DE4103740  (BRANSON ULTRASCHALL [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * the whole document * [Y] 11-15 [I] 3-6,8-10;
 [X]EP0303998  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *
International search[XY]US6036467  (JAMESON LEE KIRBY [US]) [X] 1, 12 * , abstract; column 2, lines 18-30; column 4, lines 54-63; column 5, lines 10-22; claim 1, claim 3, claim 12, figure 1. * [Y] 15-17;
 [Y]US2002019683  (WHITE DAWN [US], et al) [Y] 15-17 * , abstract; page 1, paragraphs [0007-0010]; page 2, paragraphs [0022-0023]; claims 1-26; figures 1 and 5. *;
 [XA]WO2004024415  (DKI PLAST A S [DK], et al) [X] 1, 2 * , abstract; page 3, lines 19-23; page 4, line 10; page 6, lines 24-28; page 7, lines 11-14; page 7, lines 25-27; claims 1-4; figures 1-8. * [A] 3-25;
 [A]EP0833237  (STRATASYS INC [US]) [A] 1-25 * , the whole document. *;
 [A]EP0394958  (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-25 * , the whole document. *
by applicantUS6036467
 WO2004024415
 US2002019683