Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2191011

EP2191011 - METHOD FOR SEQUENCING A POLYNUCLEOTIDE TEMPLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.02.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Illumina Cambridge Limited
Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden
Essex CB10 1XL / GB
[2010/39]
Former [2010/22]For all designated states
Illumina Cambridge
Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Nr. Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
Inventor(s)01 / BIGNELL, Helen
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford
Nr. Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
02 / GORMLEY, Niall, Anthony
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford
Nr. Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
03 / HIMS, Matthew
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford
Nr. Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
04 / SMITH, Geoffery
Chesterford Research Park
Little Chesterford Nr
Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
05 / WEST, John, Stephen
9885 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
 [2017/13]
Former [2010/22]01 / BIGNELL, Helen
Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Nr. Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
02 / GORMLEY, Niall, Anthony
Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Nr. Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
03 / HIMS, Matthew
Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Nr. Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
04 / SMITH, Geoffery
Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Nr Saffron
Walden, Essex CB10 1XL / GB
05 / WEST, John, Stephen
9885 Towne Centre Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
Representative(s)Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele , et al
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/13]Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele , et al
Hoefer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Former [2010/39]Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele , et al
Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20
81543 München / DE
Former [2010/22]Barnes, Colin Lloyd
Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford
Essex CB10 1XL / GB
Application number, filing date08829345.128.08.2008
[2010/22]
WO2008US10206
Priority number, dateUS20070968770P29.08.2007         Original published format: US 968770 P
US20070990104P26.11.2007         Original published format: US 990104 P
US20080046203P18.04.2008         Original published format: US 46203 P
[2016/43]
Former [2010/22]US20070968770P29.08.2007
US20070990104P26.11.2007
US2008004620318.04.2008
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009032167
Date:12.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2191011
Date:02.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2009
[2010/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2191011
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12N15/10
[2010/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/13]
Former [2010/22]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SEQUENZIERUNG EINER POLYNUKLEOTIDMATRIZE[2010/22]
English:METHOD FOR SEQUENCING A POLYNUCLEOTIDE TEMPLATE[2010/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE SÉQUENÇAGE D'UNE MATRICE DE POLYNUCLÉOTIDES[2010/22]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2010National basic fee paid 
29.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/22]
10.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
28.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.01.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.01.2017Fee for grant paid
25.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.02.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
15.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.08.2010
Opposition(s)03.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.08.2008
AT29.03.2017
CY29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE28.08.2017
LU28.08.2017
MT28.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU28.08.2008
AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE28.08.2017
LU28.08.2017
MT28.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/43]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE28.08.2017
LU28.08.2017
MT28.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/39]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE28.08.2017
LU28.08.2017
BE31.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/34]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
IE28.08.2017
LU28.08.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/25]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SI29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/21]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
CH31.08.2017
LI31.08.2017
Former [2018/18]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
MC29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
DK29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
PT31.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
PL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT29.03.2017
CZ29.03.2017
EE29.03.2017
ES29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
IT29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
RO29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
SK29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
IS29.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ29.03.2017
FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI29.03.2017
HR29.03.2017
LT29.03.2017
LV29.03.2017
NL29.03.2017
SE29.03.2017
BG29.06.2017
NO29.06.2017
GR30.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006292611  (BERKA JAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8-12 * the whole document * * figure 12 * * paragraphs [0150] - [0162] *;
 [DX]WO2007091077  (SOLEXA LTD [GB]; VERMAAS ERIC HANS [GB]; WORSLEY GRAHAM JOHN [GB]; BOU) [DX] 19,20 * the whole document * * figures 9-11 * * pages 21-22; figure 4 *;
 [X]WO03074734  (MANTEIA S A [CH]; MAYER PASCAL [FR]; LEVIEV ILIA [CH]; OSTERAS MAGNE [) [X] 19,20 * the whole document * * pages 51-52; example 3 *;
 [X]US2006024681  (SMITH DOUGLAS R [US] ET AL) [X] 19 * figures 6,7 * * the whole document * * paragraph [0120]; example 2 *;
 [X]WO2007076726  (LOK SI [CN]) [X] 19 * the whole document * * page 6; example 7 *;
 [X]EP0438292  (JAPAN CHEM RES [JP]) [X] 14,15 * the whole document * * column 1, lines 36-43 *;
 [A]US5118604  (WEISSMAN SHERMAN M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1647602  (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5935788  (BURMER GLENNA C [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * * example 1 *;
 [DA]WO2007010251  (SOLEXA LTD [GB]; LIU XIAOHAI [GB]; MILTON JOHN [GB]; SMITH GEOFFREY PA) [DA] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2005093094  (GENIZON SVENSKA AB [SE]; LINNARSSON STEN [SE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - SAN LUIS BORIS B ET AL, "Analysis of a gene (vch) encoding hemolysin isolated and sequenced from Vibrio campbellii", JOURNAL OF GENERAL AND APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY, (200612), vol. 52, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1260, pages 303 - 313, XP002512992 [X] 14,15 * the whole document * * pages 307-308 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2323/jgam.52.303
 [AP]  - MARDIS ELAINE R, "Next-generation DNA sequencing methods", ANNUAL REVIEW OF GENOMICS AND HUMAN GENETICS, (2008), vol. 9, ISSN 1527-8204, pages 387 - 402, XP002512993 [AP] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/ANNUREV.GENOM.9.081307.164359
ExaminationWO2007061284