Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2192946

EP2192946 - IN-BODY DEVICE WITH VIRTUAL DIPOLE SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Proteus Digital Health, Inc.
2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
[N/P]
Former [2012/43]For all designated states
Proteus Digital Health, Inc.
2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101
Redwood City CA 94065 / US
Former [2010/23]For all designated states
Proteus Biomedical, Inc.
2600 Bridge Parkway, Suite 101
Redwood City, CA 94065 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAFEZI, Hooman
64 Eddystock Court
Redwood City California 94065 / US
02 / COSTELLO, Benedict James
1316 Josephine Street
Berkeley California 94703 / US
03 / ROBERTSON, Timothy L.
2719 Sequoia Way
Belmont California 94002 / US
04 / CASILLAS HOLEN, Maria
2261 River Bed Court
Santa Clara California 95054 / US
 [2010/23]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
Murgitroyd House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/39]Keane, David Colman , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2010/23]Duxbury, Stephen , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Pettenkoferstrasse 37
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date08832785.325.09.2008
[2010/23]
WO2008US77753
Priority number, dateUS20070975108P25.09.2007         Original published format: US 975108 P
[2010/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009042812
Date:02.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2192946
Date:09.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009
[2010/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US02.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/07, A61B5/145, H01Q1/22, H01Q1/27, H01Q1/40, H01Q9/16, A61B1/00
[2013/11]
Former International [2010/23]A61N1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/23]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÖRPERINTERNE VORRICHTUNG MIT VIRTUELLER DIPOL-SIGNAL-VERSTÄRKUNG[2010/23]
English:IN-BODY DEVICE WITH VIRTUAL DIPOLE SIGNAL AMPLIFICATION[2010/23]
French:DISPOSITIF INTRA-CORPOREL À AMPLIFICATION DE SIGNAL DE DIPÔLE VIRTUEL[2010/23]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2009National basic fee paid 
31.03.2009Search fee paid 
31.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2009Examination requested  [2010/23]
28.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.01.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
29.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
28.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XY]EP1702553  (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,7-11,13 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0079]; figures 1, 3, 7 * [Y] 2,4-6,12;
 [Y]US2006289640  (MERCURE PETER K [US] ET AL DANOWSKI KRISTINE L [US] ET AL) [Y] 2,4-6,12 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0068]; figures 1, 15 *;
 [A]US5757326  (KOYAMA SHUNSUKE [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column 6, line 40 - column 7, line 21 * * column 8, line 8 - line 34 * * column 11, line 65 - column 12, line 40; figures 1A, 1B, 13, 14 *;
 [A]US3893111  (COTTER JOHN L) [A] 1-13 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 7; figures 1, 2 *
International search[Y]US2002077620  (SWEENEY ET AL.);
 [Y]US2005117389  (WORLEDGE);
 [Y]US2005267556  (SHUROS ET AL.);
 [Y]US2007167495  (BROWN ET AL.);
 [Y]US2007073353  (ROONEY ET AL.)