Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2194886

EP2194886 - APPLICATOR, ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING AN INLET CONDUIT TO A HOLLOW ORGAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.12.2017  [2017/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Correx, INC.
135 Beaver Street, Suite 203
Waltham, MA 02452 / US
[2010/24]
Inventor(s)01 / BEANE, Richard, M.
52 Burr Road
Hingham MA 02043 / US
02 / BROWN, John, W.
7970 N. Illinois Street
Indianapolis IN 46260 / US
03 / CRUNKLETON, James, Alan
186 Merriam Street
Weston MA 02493 / US
04 / GAMMIE, James, S.
2207 Wiltonwood Road
Stevenson MD 21153 / US
05 / SMITH, Joseph, L.
113 Oak Road
Concord MA 01742 / US
 [2010/24]
Representative(s)Küchler, Stefan
Patentanwalt
Färberstrasse 20
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/24]Küchler, Stefan
Färberstraße 20
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date08833727.425.09.2008
[2010/24]
WO2008US77760
Priority number, dateUS20070974893P25.09.2007         Original published format: US 974893 P
[2010/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009042816
Date:02.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/14]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2194886
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2009
[2010/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/11
[2010/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/24]
TitleGerman:APPLIKATOR, ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG EINER EINLASSLEITUNG MIT EINEM HOHLORGAN[2010/24]
English:APPLICATOR, ASSEMBLY, AND METHOD FOR CONNECTING AN INLET CONDUIT TO A HOLLOW ORGAN[2010/24]
French:APPLICATEUR, ASSEMBLAGE ET PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À CONNECTER UN CONDUIT D'ADMISSION À UN ORGANE CREUX[2010/24]
Entry into regional phase22.04.2010National basic fee paid 
22.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
22.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/26]
28.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/52]
03.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/52]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
01.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201306   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2014
30.09.201508   M06   Fee paid on   11.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2007081418  (CORREX INC [US]; BEANE RICHARD M [US]; BROWN JOHN W [US]; CRUNKLETON J) [X] 1-18 * page 8, paragraph 34 - page 21, paragraph 66 * * figure - *;
 [X]US2005251187  (BEANE RICHARD M [US] ET AL) [X] 1-18 * page 8, paragraph 103 - page 14, paragraph 144 * * figures 3-7A,16-23E *