Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2203451

EP2203451 - SUBSTITUTED 6-(ALKYLBENZYLAMINO)PURINE DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS CYTOKININ RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS AND PREPARATIONS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita palackeho V Olomouci
Krizkovskeho 8
77147 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Freie Universität Berlin
Kaiserswerther Strasse 16-18
14195 Berlin / DE
[2014/31]
Former [2010/27]For all designated states
Univerzita palackeho V Olomouci
Krizkovskeho 8
77147 Olomouc / CZ
For all designated states
Freie Universität Berlin
Kaiserswerther Strasse 16-18
14195 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SPICHAL, Lukas
Tr. Svornosti 14
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
02 / POPA, Igor
Masarykova 61
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
03 / VOLLER, Jiri
Pristavni ulice 10B
635 00 Brno-Bystrc / CZ
04 / DOLEZAL, Karel
Posluchov 31
78365 Hlubocky / CZ
05 / STRNAD, Miroslav
Zapadni 25
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
06 / WERNER, Tomas
Gustav-Muller-Str. 3
10829 Berlin / DE
07 / SCHMULLING, Thomas
Preussenallee 30
14052 Berlin / DE
 [2010/27]
Representative(s)Gabrielova, Marta
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2014/31]
Former [2010/27]Gabrielova, Marta
Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
Application number, filing date08836001.103.10.2008
[2010/27]
WO2008CZ00118
Priority number, dateCZ2007000069105.10.2007         Original published format: CZ 20070691
[2010/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009043320
Date:09.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2203451
Date:07.07.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009
[2010/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2203451
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Search report(s)International search reportEP28.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07D473/34, A61K31/52, A01N43/00
[2010/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/27]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SUBSTITUIERTE 6-(ALKYLBENZYLAMINO)PURIN-DERIVATE ALS ZYTOKININ-REZEPTORANTAGONISTEN UND ZUBEREITUNGEN MIT DIESEN DERIVATEN[2010/27]
English:SUBSTITUTED 6-(ALKYLBENZYLAMINO)PURINE DERIVATIVES FOR USE AS CYTOKININ RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS AND PREPARATIONS CONTAINING THESE DERIVATIVES[2010/27]
French:DÉRIVÉS DE 6-(ALKYLBENZYLAMINI)PURINE SUBSTITUÉS S'UTILISANT COMME ANTAGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR DE LA CYTOKINE ET PRÉPARATIONS CONTENANT CES DÉRIVÉS[2010/27]
Entry into regional phase19.04.2010National basic fee paid 
19.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/27]
11.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.06.2014Fee for grant paid
18.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2012
Opposition(s)04.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
09.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
MT30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
IE03.10.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]AT30.07.2014
BE30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
TR30.07.2014
IE03.10.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/50]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
SI30.07.2014
IE03.10.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
IE03.10.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/36]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
GB30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/33]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/30]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/27]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
MC30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/26]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
LU03.10.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
CZ30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
EE30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
DK30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
IT30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
RO30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT30.07.2014
CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
HR30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
LV30.07.2014
NL30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
IS30.11.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY30.07.2014
ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
GR31.10.2014
PT02.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES30.07.2014
FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
BG30.10.2014
NO30.10.2014
Former [2015/09]FI30.07.2014
LT30.07.2014
SE30.07.2014
Former [2015/08]LT30.07.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03040144  (USTAV EX BOTAN AKADEMIE VED CE [CZ], et al) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO9720842  (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *
 [X]  - BRATHE A ET AL, "Synthesis of 6-Alkenyl- and 6-Alkynylpurines with Cytokinin Activity", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990101), vol. 55, no. 1, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 211 - 228, XP004150864 [X] 1-15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(98)01027-8
Examination   - RIEFLER M ET AL: "Arabidopsis cytokinin receptor mutants reveal functions in shoot growth, leaf senescence, seed size, germination, root development, and cytokinin metabolism", THE PLANT CELL, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT BIOLOGISTS, US, vol. 18, 1 January 2006 (2006-01-01), pages 40-54, XP002362525, ISSN: 1040-4651, DOI: 10.1105/TPC.105.037796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.105.037796
    - HIGUCHI MASAYUKI ET AL: "In planta functions of the Arabidopsis cytokinin receptor family", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 101, no. 23, 8 June 2004 (2004-06-08) , pages 8821-8826, XP002362523, ISSN: 0027-8424, DOI: 10.1073/PNAS.0402887101

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0402887101
    - NISHIMURA ET AL.: "Genetic analysis of arabidopsis histidine kinase genes encoding cytokinin receptors reveals their overlapping biological functions in the regulation of shoot and root growth in arabidopsis thaliana", THE PLANT CELL, 2004, pages 1-13,