Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2198235

EP2198235 - AUTOMATIC OR SEMIAUTOMATIC RIFLE WITH FOLDING CLAMSHELL BUTTSTOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.08.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colt's Manufacturing IP Holding Company LLC
545 New Park Avenue
West Hartford, CT 06110 / US
[2017/07]
Former [2010/25]For all designated states
Colt Defense LLC
P.O. Box 1868
Hartford, CT 06144-1868 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LANGEVIN, Kevin
35 Harris Street
Berlin CT 06037 / US
02 / HOCHSTRATE, Paul
70 Maxwell Drive
Plantsville CT 06479 / US
03 / MISTRY, Sachin
98a Elizabeth Avenue
Pittsfield MA 01201 / US
04 / HARTSIG, William
54 East Housatonic Avenue Apt. 2
Pittsfield MA 01201 / US
05 / THUNE, Gregory
616 Woodlake Court
Westerville OH 43081 / US
06 / AUDIBERT, Kevin
27 Overvale Road
Wolcott CT 06716 / US
 [2010/25]
Representative(s)Ipside
7-9 Allées Haussmann
33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/25]Coquel, Jean-Marc
Schmit-Chretien-Schihin SNC 111, cours de Médoc CS 40009
F-33070 Bordeaux Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date08836412.006.10.2008
[2010/25]
WO2008US78998
Priority number, dateUS20070977946P05.10.2007         Original published format: US 977946 P
US2008009669712.09.2008         Original published format: US 96697
[2010/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009046456
Date:09.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2198235
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009
[2010/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2013
ClassificationInternational:F41C23/04
[2013/18]
Former International [2010/25]F41C23/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/25]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHES ODER HALBAUTOMATISCHES GEWEHR MIT KLAPPHINTERSCHAFT[2010/25]
English:AUTOMATIC OR SEMIAUTOMATIC RIFLE WITH FOLDING CLAMSHELL BUTTSTOCK[2010/25]
French:FUSIL AUTOMATIQUE OU SEMI-AUTOMATIQUE À CROSSE À COQUE PLIABLE[2010/25]
Entry into regional phase30.03.2010National basic fee paid 
30.03.2010Search fee paid 
30.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
30.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.05.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/25]
03.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
25.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.06.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination11.08.2016Appeal received No.  T2434/16
21.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2014
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
25.02.2014Request for further processing filed
25.02.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.03.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
25.02.2014Request for further processing filed
25.02.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.03.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2006242880  (GRIFFIN TODD [US]) [X] 1,2,4,15 * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [0 26] , [0 30] * * figures 1-10 * [Y] 3,5-9,12 [I] 16-19;
 [XYI]US5305539  (VON KUSTER KENT [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11,13-16 * column 1, lines 46-52 * * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 3 * * figures 1, 11, 12 * [Y] 3,5-9,12 [I] 17-19;
 [X]US4735007  (GAL UZI [US]) [X] 1,2,4,15-17 * figures 2, 19, 28, 31 *;
 [A]US7065914  (WAGNER II WILLIAM FREDRICK [US]) [A] 1-3,5,6,8,10,11,13-15 * column 1, lines 28-57 * * column 3, lines 44-62 * * figures 1, 3 *
International search[X]US5305539  (VON KUSTER);
 [Y]US7162822  (HEAYN, ET AL.);
 [Y]US4383384  (FOX);
 [Y]US3209482  (KUZMA ET AL.);
 [Y]US6839998  (ARMSTRONG);
 [Y]US6560911  (SHARP)