Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2194888

EP2194888 - TREATING DYSFUNCTIONAL CARDIAC TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bioventrix, Inc.
12647 Alcosta Blvd., Suite 400
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
[2018/34]
Former [2010/24]For all designated states
Bioventrix (a Chf Technologies, Inc.)
12647 Alcosta Blvd., Suite 400
San Ramon, CA 94583 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ANNEST, Lon, S.
720 Greenwich Street, 2F
New York New York 10014-2546 / US
02 / ARGENTO, Claudio
18410 Main Blvd.
Los Gatos California 95033 / US
03 / BUTLER, William
2120 Aldrich Avenue S. Apt. 305
Minneapolis Minnesota 55405 / US
04 / HEFLIN, Ernest
2848 Jones Gate Court
Pleasanton California 94566 / US
 [2010/34]
Former [2010/24]01 / ANNEST, Lon, S.
720 Greenwich Street, 2F
New York New York 10014-2546 / US
02 / ARGENTO, Claudio
18410 Main Blvd.
Los Gatos California 95033 / US
03 / BUTLER, William
2050 Shoreline Loop
San Ramon California 94582 / US
04 / HEFLIN, Ernest
2848 Jones Gate Court
Pleasanton California 94566 / US
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/24]Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn
London EC1N 2SQ / GB
Application number, filing date08836607.503.10.2008
[2010/24]
WO2008US78810
Priority number, dateUS20070977286P03.10.2007         Original published format: US 977286 P
US20080082438P21.07.2008         Original published format: US 82438 P
[2010/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009046343
Date:09.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2194888
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009
[2010/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/04, A61B17/00
[2015/30]
Former International [2010/24]A61B17/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/24]
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG VON DYSFUNKTIONALEM HERZGEWEBE[2010/24]
English:TREATING DYSFUNCTIONAL CARDIAC TISSUE[2010/24]
French:TRAITEMENT D'UN TISSU CARDIAQUE DÉFAILLANT[2010/24]
Entry into regional phase31.03.2010National basic fee paid 
31.03.2010Search fee paid 
31.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
31.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/24]
19.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2007167687  (BERTOLERO ARTHUR A [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0168] - [0172]; figures 8a-9C *;
 [Y]WO2005110280  (VALENTX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0299] - [0308]; figures 50A-53 *;
 [X]US2006276684  (SPEZIALI GIOVANNI [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0036] *;
 [A]WO9829041  (MYOCOR INC [US]) [A] 1,3,5 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0128455  (MYOCOR INC [US], et al) [A] 1,3,5,10 * page 25, lines 17-23; figure - *;
 [A]US2004186566  (HINDRICHS PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0090] , [0091]; figures 18-19A *;
 [A]US2006241340  (SCHROEDER RICHARD [US], et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract *;
 [A]US6981983  (ROSENBLATT PETER L [US], et al) [A] 1-5,8 * figures 9A-11B, 13A- 14G *
International search[X]US2006241340  (SCHROEDER RICHARD [US], et al);
 [X]US6059715  (SCHWEICH JR CYRIL J [US], et al);
 [Y]US6776754  (WILK PETER J [US]);
 [Y]US5830224  (COHN WILLIAM E [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005065506  (PHAN HUY [US])
by applicantUS6776754
 US6059715
 US6162168
 US6125852
 US6616684
 US6808488
 US2007167687
 WO2005110280
 US2006276684
 US2008294251