Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2195777

EP2195777 - WEB SERVICE USER EXPERIENCE WITHOUT UPFRONT STORAGE EXPENSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.09.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2015/12]
Former [2010/24]For all designated states
Microsoft Corporation
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
Inventor(s)01 / LI, Margaret H.
c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / SHOROFF, Srikanth
c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / SIDDESHA, Paramesh
c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / IVANOV, Maxim A.
c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2010/24]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/24]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date08836617.419.09.2008
[2010/24]
WO2008US77043
Priority number, dateUS2007090668603.10.2007         Original published format: US 906686
[2010/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009045757
Date:09.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2195777
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2009
[2010/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR28.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/00
[2010/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/24]
TitleGerman:INTERNETDIENST-BENUTZERERFAHRUNG OHNE VORWÄRTSSPEICHERUNGSAUFWAND[2010/24]
English:WEB SERVICE USER EXPERIENCE WITHOUT UPFRONT STORAGE EXPENSE[2010/24]
French:EXPÉRIENCE D'UN UTILISATEUR D'UN SERVICE WEB EXEMPTE DE COÛTS INITIAUX DE MÉMOIRE[2010/24]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2010National basic fee paid 
08.03.2010Search fee paid 
08.03.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.03.2010Examination requested  [2010/24]
13.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2013Date of oral proceedings
21.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
21.11.2013Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination03.02.2014Appeal received No.  T0909/14
01.04.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
09.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
08.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JP2006191552  (MICROSOFT CORPORATION);
 [A]US2005102154  (RYAN A. DODD, ET AL.);
 [A]KR20070090613  (KIM, YOUNG HUN);
 [A]WO2007046596  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD, THE TRUSTEES OF COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY IN ...)