Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2195777 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2195777



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 183
14.05.2019 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.02.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
02.02.2015 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Appeal 1
14.05.2014 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
24.04.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
09.04.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
02.04.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
01.04.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
03.02.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.02.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
25.11.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.11.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
21.11.2013 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
21.11.2013 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 9
21.11.2013 Means of redress Search / examination 2
21.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
21.11.2013 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
13.09.2013 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.09.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.09.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
11.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
11.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
11.09.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
11.09.2013 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.04.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
17.04.2013 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.04.2013 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.04.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
16.04.2013 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
16.04.2013 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.09.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
05.07.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
05.07.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.12.2011 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
13.12.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
29.08.2011 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
10.08.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
10.08.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 1
10.08.2011 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
19.05.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
12.05.2010 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
29.04.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
23.04.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
08.03.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.03.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
12.02.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
28.05.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
28.05.2009 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
29.04.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38
09.04.2009 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 26