Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2199446

EP2199446 - ALUMINOUS-FIBER MASS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.02.2014
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Denki Kagaku Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8338 / JP
[2010/25]
Inventor(s)01 / OHSHIMA, Yasutaka
DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8338 / JP
02 / HIRANO, Isamu
DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8338 / JP
03 / HIGUCHI, Takayuki
DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8338 / JP
 [2013/17]
Former [2010/25]01 / OHSHIMA, Yasutaka
DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8338 / JP
02 / HIRANO, Isamu
DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8338 / JP
03 / HIGUCHI, Takayuki
DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8338 / JP
Representative(s)Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert
Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/17]Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Former [2010/25]Albrecht, Thomas
Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15
80539 München / DE
Application number, filing date08836938.429.09.2008
[2010/25]
WO2008JP67679
Priority number, dateJP2007026573711.10.2007         Original published format: JP 2007265737
[2010/25]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009048000
Date:16.04.2009
Language:JA
[2009/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2199446
Date:23.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2199446
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP16.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:D04H1/42, C08K3/22, C08L101/00, D01F9/08
[2010/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/25]
TitleGerman:ALUMINIUMHALTIGE FASERMASSE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG[2010/25]
English:ALUMINOUS-FIBER MASS, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME, AND USE[2010/25]
French:MATIÈRE DE FIBRES ALUMINEUSES, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION[2010/25]
Entry into regional phase09.04.2010Translation filed 
09.04.2010National basic fee paid 
09.04.2010Search fee paid 
09.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/25]
13.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.03.2013Fee for grant paid
08.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2012
Opposition(s)27.01.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
LU29.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/34]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
CH30.09.2013
LI30.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE29.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/14]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
DK24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/51]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
NO24.07.2013
PT26.08.2013
Documents cited:Search   [] No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[A]JPH03212454  (NICHIAS CORP);
 [A]JP2002105610  (NICHIAS CORP);
 [A]JP2006342199  (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD)