Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2202307

EP2202307 - METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.07.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2017New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
[2014/34]
Former [2010/26]For all designated states
Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha
5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMADA, Yoshiki
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1 Ukima 5-chome
Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
02 / KIYASU, Tatsuya
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1 Ukima 5-chome
Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
03 / TABATA, Kazuyuki
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1 Ukima 5-chome
Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
04 / KUZUMAKI, Akihiro
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1 Ukima 5-chome
Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
05 / YAMASHIRO, Mai
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA
5-1 Ukima 5-chome
Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
 [2014/34]
Former [2010/26]01 / YAMADA, Yoshiki
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
02 / KIYASU, Tatsuya
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
03 / TABATA, Kazuyuki
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
04 / KUZUMAKI, Akihiro
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
05 / YAMASHIRO, Mai
c/o CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1 Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku
Tokyo 115-8543 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/34]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2010/26]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date08838661.014.10.2008
[2010/26]
WO2008JP68588
Priority number, dateJP2007026738415.10.2007         Original published format: JP 2007267384
JP2008010330811.04.2008         Original published format: JP 2008103308
[2010/26]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009051108
Date:23.04.2009
Language:JA
[2009/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2202307
Date:30.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2202307
Date:20.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP23.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/09, C12N5/10, C12P21/02
[2012/04]
Former International [2010/26]C12N15/09, C07K16/00, C12N5/10, C12P21/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/26]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ANTIKÖRPERS[2010/26]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF ANTIBODY[2010/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'ANTICORPS[2010/26]
Entry into regional phase14.04.2010Translation filed 
14.04.2010National basic fee paid 
14.04.2010Search fee paid 
14.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/26]
18.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.11.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2013Observations by third parties
11.03.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.07.2014Fee for grant paid
09.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.11.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.05.2015  19.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lonza AG
Lonzastrasse
3930 Visp / CH
Opponent's representative
Schrell, Andreas
Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
 02  19.05.2015   
Sölch, Günter
Nordring 27
83624 Otterfing / DE
Opponent's representative
Keller, Günter, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 [2015/27]
Former [2015/26]
Opponent(s)01  13.05.2015  19.05.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Lonza AG
Lonzastrasse
3930 Visp / CH
Opponent's representative
Schrell, Andreas
Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Leitzstrasse 45
70469 Stuttgart / DE
25.06.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.01.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
17.10.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition16.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2697/16
24.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
MT20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
LU14.10.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/31]CY20.08.2014
EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
LU14.10.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/27]EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
MC20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
LU14.10.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/26]EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
LU14.10.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/23]EE20.08.2014
FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
SK20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/22]FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
RO20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/12]FI20.08.2014
HR20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
LV20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
IS20.12.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/11]FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
GR21.11.2014
PT22.12.2014
Former [2015/10]FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
BG20.11.2014
NO20.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI20.08.2014
LT20.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT20.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2006054063  (UCB CELLTECH [GB], et al) [A] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * claims 1, 2 * * paragraph [0002] *;
 [A]EP1674111  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * abstract * * paragraph [0088] *;
 [A]US2003104477  (BUECHLER JOE [US], et al) [A] 1-6,8-10,12,13 * the whole document *
International search[A]WO2006006693  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]WO9219759  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP])
 [X]  - SCHLATTER S. ET AL., "On the optimal ratio of heavy to light chain genes for efficient recombinant antibody production by CHO cells", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2005), vol. 21, pages 122 - 133, XP008123445

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP049780W
 [A]  - JIANG Z. ET AL., "Regulation of recombinant monoclonal antibody production in chinese hamster ovary cells: a comparative study of gene copy number, mRNA level, and protein expression.", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2006), vol. 22, pages 313 - 318, XP002525683

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP0501524
 [A]  - KOLB A.F. ET AL., "A virus-neutralising antibody is not cytotoxic in vitro.", MOL. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 43, pages 677 - 689, XP025037174

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molimm.2005.04.008
 [A]  - LEE YK. ET AL., "BiP and immunoglobulin light chain cooperate to control the folding of heavy chain and ensure the fidelity of immunoglobulin assembly.", MOL. BIOL. CELL, (1999), vol. 10, pages 2209 - 2219, XP008123368
 [A]  - DORAI H. ET AL., "Correlation of heavy and light chain mRNA copy numbers to antibody productivity in mouse myeloma production cell lines.", HYBRIDOMA, (2006), vol. 25, pages 1 - 9, XP008116842

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hyb.2006.25.1
ExaminationUS2003157641
    - KIM SANG JICK ET AL, "Characterization of chimeric antibody producing CHO cells in the course of dihydrofolate reductase-mediated gene amplification and their stability in the absence of selective pressure", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (19980405), vol. 58, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 73 - 84
    - KIM JAE HOON ET AL, "Decreased chimeric antibody productivity of KR12H-1 transfectoma during long-term culture results from decreased antibody gene copy number", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 51, no. 4, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 479 - 487
by applicantEP0239400
 WO9602576
 JPS6459878
 WO9312227
 WO9203918
 WO9402602
 WO9425585
 WO9634096
 WO9633735
 WO9201047
 WO9220791
 WO9306213
 WO9311236
 WO9319172
 WO9501438
 WO9515388
    - REFF ME; CARNER K; CHAMBERS KS; CHINN PC; LEONARD JE; RAAB R ET AL., "Depletion of B cells in vivo by a chimeric mouse human monoclonal antibody to CD20", BLOOD, (19940115), vol. 83, no. 2, pages 435 - 45
    - PRESTA LG; CHEN H; O'CONNOR SJ; CHISHOLM V; MENG YQ; KRUMMEN L ET AL., "Humanization of an anti-vascular endothelial growth factor monoclonal antibody for the therapy of solid tumors and other disorders", CANCER RES., (19971015), vol. 57, no. 20, pages 4593 - 9
    - MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF THE CELL, (1999), vol. 10, page 2209
    - BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2005), vol. 21, page 122
    - MULLIGAN ET AL., NATURE, (1979), vol. 277, page 108
    - MIZUSHIMA ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1990), vol. 18, page 5322
    - NIWA ET AL., GENE, (1991), vol. 108, page 193
    - CHO, J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 108, page 945
    - VAIIE ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 291, pages 358 - 340
    - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220
    - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1968), vol. 60, page 1275
    - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 7380 - 7384
    - EBERT ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 699 - 702
    - SUSUMU ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, pages 592 - 594
    - JULIAN ET AL., EUR. J: IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 131 - 138
    - KOHLER, G; MILSTEIN, C., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1981), vol. 73, pages 3 - 46
    - SATO, K. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 851 - 856
otherUS2003157641
    - SCHLATTER S. ET AL, "On the optimal ratio of heavy to light chain genes for efficient recombinant antibody production by CHO cells", BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2005), vol. 21, pages 122 - 133, XP008123445

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/BP049780W
    - KIM S.J. ET AL, "Characterization of chimeric antibody producing CHO cells in the course of dihydrofolate reductase-mediated gene amplification and their stability in the absence of selective pressure", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1998), vol. 58, pages 73 - 84, XP008107974
    - KIM J.H. ET AL, "Decreased chimeric antibody productivity of KR12H-1 transfectoma during long-term culture results from decreased antibody gene copy number", BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (1996), vol. 51, pages 479 - 487, XP003029353

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19960820)51:4<479::AID-BIT11>3.3.CO;2-2