Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2203402

EP2203402 - PROCESSES FOR SYNTHESIS OF FLUORINATED OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.01.2014
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
31.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2010/27]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MUKHOPADHYAY, Sudip
c/o Honeywell International Inc.
Patent Services M/S - AB/2B
P.O. Box 22445
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
02 / LIGHT, Barbara A.
5200 Grauer Road
Niagara Falls New York 14305 / US
03 / CANTLON, Cheryl L.
9785 Tonawanda Creek Road
Clarence Center New York 14032 / US
04 / JOHNSON, Robert C.
15 Maple Avenue
Lancaster New York 14086 / US
05 / BORTZ, Cheryl, L.
864 Sun Valley Drive
North Tonawanda, New York 14120 / US
 [2014/10]
Former [2010/30]01 / MUKHOPADHYAY, Sudip
c/o Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S - AB/2B P.O. Box 22445
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
02 / LIGHT, Barbara A.
5200 Grauer Road
Niagara Falls New York 14305 / US
03 / CANTLON, Cheryl L.
9785 Tonawanda Creek Road
Clarence Center New York 14032 / US
04 / JOHNSON, Robert C.
15 Maple Avenue
Lancaster New York 14086 / US
05 / BORTZ, Cheryl, L.
864 Sun Valley Drive
North Tonawanda, New York 14120 / US
Former [2010/27]01 / MUKHOPADHYAY, Sudip
1121 Northwood Drive
Williamsville New York 14221 / US
02 / LIGHT, Barbara A.
5200 Grauer Road
Niagara Falls New York 14305 / US
03 / CANTLON, Cheryl L.
9785 Tonawanda Creek Road
Clarence Center New York 14032 / US
04 / JOHNSON, Robert C.
15 Maple Avenue
Lancaster New York 14086 / US
05 / BORTZ, Cheryl, L.
864 Sun Valley Drive
North Tonawanda, New York 14120 / US
Representative(s)Crooks, Elizabeth Caroline , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/10]Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2011/24]Hucker, Charlotte Jane
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
Former [2010/27]Buckley, Guy Julian
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell
GB-Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date08840751.514.10.2008
[2010/27]
WO2008US79759
Priority number, dateUS20070068509P15.10.2007         Original published format: US 68509 P
US2008024995812.10.2008         Original published format: US 249958
[2015/03]
Former [2010/27]US2007006850915.10.2007
US2008024995812.10.2008
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009052064
Date:23.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2203402
Date:07.07.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2009
[2010/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2203402
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.06.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.01.2011
ClassificationInternational:C07C17/25, C07C21/18, C07C19/08, C07C17/21, C07C17/23
[2013/32]
Former International [2010/27]C07C17/25, C07C21/18, C07C19/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE FLUORIERTER OLEFINE[2010/27]
English:PROCESSES FOR SYNTHESIS OF FLUORINATED OLEFINS[2010/27]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE SYNTHÈSE D'OLÉFINES FLUORÉES[2010/27]
Entry into regional phase06.04.2010National basic fee paid 
06.04.2010Search fee paid 
06.04.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
06.04.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.04.2010Examination requested  [2010/27]
15.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
18.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2014Fee for grant paid
17.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.12.2014  08.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris, et al
ARKEMA France
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2015/03]
Opponent(s)01  01.12.2014  08.12.2014  ADMISSIBLE
ARKEMA France
420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92700 Colombes / FR
Opponent's representative
Dang, Doris, et al
ARKEMA FRANCE
Département Propriété Industrielle
420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves
92705 Colombes Cedex / FR
28.01.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
23.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
08.02.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
08.02.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0813/17
26.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
05.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
07.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.10.2008
AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
MT05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
TR05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
IE14.10.2014
LU14.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU14.10.2008
AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
TR05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
IE14.10.2014
LU14.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2016/28]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
GR06.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
IE14.10.2014
LU14.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/46]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
IE14.10.2014
LU14.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/33]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
LU14.10.2014
CH31.10.2014
LI31.10.2014
Former [2015/27]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
MC05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
LU14.10.2014
Former [2015/26]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
LU14.10.2014
Former [2015/24]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SI05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
DK05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
PT07.07.2014
Former [2014/50]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
NL05.03.2014
PL05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
SK05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
Former [2014/49]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
RO05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
IS05.07.2014
Former [2014/48]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
CZ05.03.2014
EE05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
BG05.06.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/46]AT05.03.2014
BE05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
HR05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
LV05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT05.03.2014
CY05.03.2014
FI05.03.2014
LT05.03.2014
SE05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT05.03.2014
NO05.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[E]WO2009018561  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]; JOHNSON ROBERT C [US]; TUNG HSUEH SUNG [US]; M) [E] 1,2,7-10 * page 4, line 16 - line 25 * * examples 1-4 * * page 16, line 7 * * page 13, line 9 - line 29 * * page 6, line 12 - page 12, line 12 *;
 [E]WO2009026526  (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]; PHILLIPS STEVEN [US]; FLEMING KIM [US]; DUBEY) [E] 1,2,7 * page 9, line 16 - page 10, line 4 * * page 15, line 8 - line 20 * * examples * * page 13, line 21 - page 14, line 25 *
International search[A]WO2007019355  (E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY);
 [A]WO2007053736  (E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY);
 [A]US2007197842  (SUDIP MUKHOPADHYAY ET AL.)