Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2206019

EP2206019 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A RELIEF IMAGE ARRANGEMENT USABLE IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF FLEXOGRAPHY AND ARRANGEMENT PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.10.2012
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MacDermid Printing Solutions Europe SAS
rue de l'Industrie
68700 Cernay / FR
[2010/28]
Inventor(s)01 / BERTRAND, Dominique
18 rue des Cèdres
F-68700 Cernay / FR
02 / BOUKAFTANE, Chouaib
1118 Calibre Lake Pkwy SE
USA-Smyrna, GEORGIA 30082 / US
03 / GRAB, Christian
Obere Erlen 14a
CH-6020 Emmenbrucke / CH
 [2010/40]
Former [2010/28]01 / BERTRAND, Dominique
18 rue des Cèdres
F-68700 Cernay / FR
02 / BOUKAFTANE, Chouaib
10 rue Daguerre
F-68200 Mulhouse / FR
03 / GRAB, Christian
Obere Erlen 14a
CH-6020 Emmenbrucke / CH
Representative(s)Thinat, Michel
Cabinet Weinstein
176 avenue Charles de Gaulle
92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/28]Thinat, Michel
Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré
75008 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date08842022.902.10.2008
[2010/28]
WO2008FR51787
Priority number, dateFR2007005811705.10.2007         Original published format: FR 0758117
[2010/28]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009053586
Date:30.04.2009
Language:FR
[2009/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2206019
Date:14.07.2010
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009
[2010/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20, B41C1/02, B41N1/00
[2010/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER RELIEFBILDANORDNUNG, IM BESONDEREN FÜR FLEXODRUCK UND NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE ANORDNUNG[2010/28]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING A RELIEF IMAGE ARRANGEMENT USABLE IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF FLEXOGRAPHY AND ARRANGEMENT PRODUCED ACCORDING TO THIS METHOD.[2010/28]
French:PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN AGENCEMENT A IMAGE EN RELIEF UTILISABLE NOTAMMENT DANS LE DOMAINE DE LA FLEXOGRAPHIE ET AGENCEMENT REALISE SELON CE PROCEDE[2010/28]
Entry into regional phase03.05.2010National basic fee paid 
03.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
03.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/28]
06.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.03.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination29.01.2016Appeal received No.  T1359/16
25.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
29.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201912   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1746462  (PUNCH GRAPHIX PREPRESS GERMANY [DE]) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO03058349  (MACDERMID GRAPHIC ARTS S A [FR]; KUCZYNSKI JERZY [FR]; RICH GERARD [FR) [DA] 4,5,12,15-17,22,23,25,26,29 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5783356  (BOSSCHAERTS JACOBUS [BE] ET AL) [A] 3,11,13,14,21,27,28,30 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9964929  (ROCHESTER PHOTONICS CORP [US]; RAGUIN DANIEL N [US]; MORRIS G MICHAEL) [A] 1,2 * pages 9-14; figures 3a,7,13 *;
 [A]US2005058948  (FREESE ROBERT P [US] ET AL) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *