Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2212892

EP2212892 - SEMICONDUCTIVE POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Borealis Technology OY
P.O.Box 330
06101 Porvoo / FI
[2010/31]
Inventor(s)01 / NOYENS, Koenraad
Winkelomseheide 207
B-2440 Geel / BE
02 / DE VLEESSCHAUER, Marc
Vitsenveld 88
B-2550 Kontich / BE
 [2010/39]
Former [2010/31]01 / NOYENS, Koenraad
Winkelomseheide 207
B-2440 Geel / BE
02 / DE VLEESSCHAUER, Marc
Vitsenveld 8
B-2550 Kontich / BE
Representative(s)Prins, Hendrik Willem , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[2017/07]
Former [2011/17]Prins, Hendrik Willem , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2010/31]Nollen, Maarten Dirk-Johan , et al
Bird & Bird LLP Van Alkemadelaan 700
NL-2597 AW Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date08842389.222.10.2008
[2010/31]
WO2008EP08926
Priority number, dateEP2007002073523.10.2007         Original published format: EP 07020735
[2010/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009053042
Date:30.04.2009
Language:EN
[2009/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2212892
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2009
[2010/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2212892
Date:15.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01B1/24, C08K3/04, C08J3/20
[2010/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/07]
Former [2010/31]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:HALBLEITENDE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2010/31]
English:SEMICONDUCTIVE POLYMER COMPOSITION[2010/31]
French:COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE[2016/31]
Former [2010/31]COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE SEMI-CONDUCTEUR
Entry into regional phase20.05.2010National basic fee paid 
20.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/31]
06.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.04.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.10.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.09.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.2016Fee for grant paid
12.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.11.2017  20.11.2017  ADMISSIBLE
The Dow Chemical Company
2030 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
Carnegieplein 5
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 [2017/52]
14.12.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.04.2018Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.04.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.06.2019
06.06.2019Date of oral proceedings
08.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
24.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
21.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.10.2008
AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB22.10.2017
IE22.10.2017
LU22.10.2017
MT22.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/45]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB22.10.2017
IE22.10.2017
LU22.10.2017
MT22.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/43]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB22.10.2017
LU22.10.2017
MT22.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/36]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB22.10.2017
LU22.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/35]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
GB22.10.2017
LU22.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/29]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
MC15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SI15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
DK15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
PL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
EE15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
IT15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
RO15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
SK15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT15.02.2017
CZ15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT15.02.2017
FI15.02.2017
HR15.02.2017
LT15.02.2017
LV15.02.2017
NL15.02.2017
SE15.02.2017
BG15.05.2017
NO15.05.2017
GR16.05.2017
PT15.06.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US2001031823  (ATCHETEE MICHAEL J [BE], et al) [X] 1-29,32-54 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0015] , [0030] , [0036] - [0051]; example 6; table 4 *;
 [X]EP1548752  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [X] 1-20,23-29,32-64 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0039] , [0040] , [0046]; examples 1-4; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]US6086792  (REID CHARLES G [US], et al) [X] 1-20,23-29,32-54 * column 1, line 9 - line 38 * * column 4, line 15 - line 41 * * column 5, line 37 - column 8, line 63; examples 1-21; table 3 *;
 [X]US4702860  (KINDEROV PETR A [SU], et al) [X] 1-12,17,19-20,23-30,32-44 * example 4; claims 1-5 *
OppositionUS6086792
 EP1548752
 US2001031823
 US6565779
 US4526707
    - "Standard Test Method for Carbon Black - Pellet Size Distribution", ASTM D1511-00, (20000000), pages 1 - 4, XP055439543
    - COLIN G. RICHARDSON, "Compounding Semiconductives for High Voltage Cable", 7th International Conference on Power Insulated Cables ''JICABLE'07, (20070628), XP055439578
    - "Surface Smoothness Test for Power Cable Semi- Conductive Compounds (Semicons)", Cabot brochure, (20020200), XP055439589
    - SUH JOON HAN et al., "Overview of Semiconductive Shield Technology in Power Distribution Cables", IEEE Power Electric Society Transmission and Distribution, (20060521), pages 641 - 646, XP031331120
    - W.-K. LEE, "A study of electric stress enhancement. Part 1. Implication in power cable design", IEEE Transactions on Dielectrics and Electrical Insulation, (20040000), vol. 11, no. 6, pages 976 - 982, XP055439599

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TDEI.2004.1387820