Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2207841

EP2207841 - EXTRUDED POLYMER FOAMS CONTAINING BROMINATED FATTY ACID-BASED FLAME RETARDANT ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Database last updated on 26.09.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2011/16]
Former [2010/29]For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies Inc.
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KRUYPER, William, J.
230 Barden Road
Sanford MI 48675 / US
02 / ARROWSMITH, David, Richard
Rosenstrasse 29c
77855 Achern / DE
03 / ROMER, Duane
4025 Lowell Court
Midland MI 48642 / US
04 / BELL, Bruce, M.
401 Saginaw Road
P.O. Box 76
Higgins Lake
MI 48627 / US
05 / STOBBY, William
209 Hubbard Street
Midland MI 48640 / US
06 / BEULICH, Inken
Hauptstrasse 60
77815 Buehl / DE
07 / LYSENKO, Zenon
214 W. Meadowbrook Drive
Midland MI 48640 / US
08 / DUFFY, John, D.
2 Square D'Helsinki
F-67610 La Wantzenau / FR
09 / VO, Chau, Van
42 A Rue Du Canal
F-67460 Souffelweyersheim / FR
[2011/37]
Former [2010/29]01 / KRUYPER, William, J.
230 Barden Road
Sanford MI 48675 / US
02 / ARROWSMITH, David, Richard
Rosenstrasse 29c
77855 Achern / DE
03 / ROMER, Duane
4025 Lowell Court
Midland MI 48642 / US
04 / BELL, Bruce, M.
401 Saginaw Road P.O. Box 76 Higgins Lake
MI 48627 / US
05 / STOBBY, William
209 Hubbard Street
Midland MI 48640 / US
06 / BEULICH, Inken
Hauptstrasse 60
77815 Buehl / DE
07 / LYSENKO, Zenon
214 W. Meadowbrook Drive
Midland MI 48640 / US
08 / DUFFY, John, D.
2 Square D'Helsinki
F-67610 La Wantzenau / FR
09 / VO, Chau, Van
42 A Rue Du Canal
F-67460 Souffelweyersheim / FR
Representative(s)Raynor, John , et al
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/29]Raynor, John , et al
Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London
WC1V 6HR / GB
Application number, filing date08845889.808.10.2008
[2010/29]
WO2008US79171
Priority number, dateUS20070001579P02.11.2007         Original published format: US 1579 P
[2010/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009058530
Date:07.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2207841
Date:21.07.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2009
[2010/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2207841
Date:14.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/37]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
EP07.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:C08J9/00, C08K5/00, C08K5/095
[2010/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/29]
TitleGerman:EXTRUDIERTE POLYMERSCHAUMSTOFFE MIT BROMIERTEN FLAMMENRESISTENTEN ZUSÄTZEN AUF FETTSÄUREBASIS[2011/09]
English:EXTRUDED POLYMER FOAMS CONTAINING BROMINATED FATTY ACID-BASED FLAME RETARDANT ADDITIVES[2010/29]
French:MOUSSES POLYMÈRES EXTRUDÉES CONTENANT DES ADDITIFS IGNIFUGEANTS À BASE D'ACIDES GRAS BROMÉS[2010/29]
Former [2010/29]EXTRUDIERTE POLYMERSCHAUMSTOFFE MIT BROMINIERTEN FLAMMENRESISTENTEN ZUSÄTZEN AUF FETTSÄUREBASIS
Entry into regional phase02.06.2010National basic fee paid 
02.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/29]
28.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2011Fee for grant paid
27.07.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2010
Opposition(s)15.06.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
HU14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
IE08.10.2011
LU08.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
BG14.12.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/29]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
IE08.10.2011
LU08.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
BG14.12.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2013/25]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
IE08.10.2011
LU08.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2013/22]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
IE08.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
ES25.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2013/14]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
MT14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
IE08.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2012/47]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
IE08.10.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2012/35]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
DK14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2012/26]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
PL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2012/24]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
MC31.10.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
EE14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
IT14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
NL14.09.2011
RO14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
SK14.09.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
PT16.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
CZ14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
IS14.01.2012
Former [2012/18]AT14.09.2011
BE14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
Former [2012/13]AT14.09.2011
CY14.09.2011
FI14.09.2011
HR14.09.2011
LT14.09.2011
LV14.09.2011
SE14.09.2011
SI14.09.2011
NO14.12.2011
GR15.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[AD]US3359220
 [A]WO2004016712
 [A]DE3936394
 [AP]WO2008030399
by applicant US3359220
    - SNYDER ET AL. J. AM. OIL CHEM. SOC. vol. 59, no. 11, 1982, pages 469 - 470
    - MCCUTCHEON: 'Org. Synth.', vol. 3, 1955, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC. pages 526 - 528