Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2202934

EP2202934 - A MULTIMEDIA SESSION CALL CONTROL METHOD AND THE APPLICATION SERVER THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.04.2014
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2010/26]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / LONG, Shuiping
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / JIN, Hui
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/19]
Former [2010/26]01 / LONG, Shuiping
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / JIN, Hui
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/19]
Former [2010/26]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date08846806.104.11.2008
[2010/26]
WO2008CN72924
Priority number, dateCN20071016578305.11.2007         Original published format: CN200710165783
[2010/26]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009059559
Date:14.05.2009
Language:ZH
[2009/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2202934
Date:30.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2202934
Date:07.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN14.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2010/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/26]
TitleGerman:EIN MULTIMEDIA SESSION ANRUFKONTROLLVERFAHREN UND DER ZUGEHÖRIGE APPLIKATIONSSERVER[2010/26]
English:A MULTIMEDIA SESSION CALL CONTROL METHOD AND THE APPLICATION SERVER THEREOF[2010/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'APPEL DE SESSION MULTIMÉDIA ET SERVEUR D'APPLICATION[2010/26]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2010Translation filed 
05.05.2010National basic fee paid 
05.05.2010Search fee paid 
05.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
05.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/26]
15.03.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.03.2014Fee for grant paid
13.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.03.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.02.2015  11.02.2015  ADMISSIBLE
James Poole Limited
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Opponent's representative
Brunner, John Michael Owen
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
 [2015/12]
13.03.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
19.08.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
03.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition14.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1680/16
16.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.11.2008
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GB04.11.2018
FR30.11.2018
NL01.12.2018
DE01.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2019/49]HU04.11.2008
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
FR30.11.2018
NL01.12.2018
DE01.06.2019
Former [2019/40]HU04.11.2008
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
NL01.12.2018
Former [2016/33]HU04.11.2008
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
MT07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/32]HU04.11.2008
AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
TR07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/25]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
BG07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
IE04.11.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/36]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SI07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
LU04.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
MC07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
LU04.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
LU04.11.2014
Former [2015/22]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
IT07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/11]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
RO07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/10]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
CZ07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
EE07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
SK07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT07.05.2014
BE07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
DK07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2015/02]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
PT08.09.2014
Former [2014/51]AT07.05.2014
CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY07.05.2014
ES07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
HR07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
LV07.05.2014
PL07.05.2014
SE07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
GR08.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY07.05.2014
FI07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
NO07.08.2014
IS07.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY07.05.2014
LT07.05.2014
Former [2014/47]CY07.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and Architecture; Feasibility Study on Multimedia Session Continuity; Stage 2; (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TR 23.893, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20071001), no. V0.3.0, pages 1 - 33, XP050361615 [Y] 1-10,13-15 * page 7 - page 23 *
 [Y]  - ELLEUCH W ET AL, "Enabling Session Mobility in Full Mesh Conferencing Model", WIRELESS AND MOBILE COMPUTING, NETWORKING AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2007. WIMOB 2007. THIRD IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071008), page 49, XP031338332 [Y] 1-10,13-15 * the whole document *
International search[A]US2007250569  (MUTIKAINEN JARI [FI], et al);
 [A]CN1980225  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]CN101026616  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]);
 [A]WO2006044098  (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al)