blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2218470

EP2218470 - HEMODIALYSIS APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  06.09.2013
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2013Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.10.2013  [2013/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JMS Co.
12-17, Kako-machi Naka-ku, Hiroshima-shi
Hiroshima 730-8652 / JP
[2010/33]
Inventor(s)01 / MASAOKA, Katsunori
c/o JMS CO. 12-17 Kako-machi Naka-ku
Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 730-8652 / JP
 [2010/33]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/33]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date08847738.527.10.2008
[2010/33]
WO2008JP69439
Priority number, dateJP2007028809406.11.2007         Original published format: JP 2007288094
[2010/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2009060741
Date:14.05.2009
Language:JA
[2009/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2218470
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.05.2009
ClassificationIPC:A61M1/14
[2010/33]
CPC:
A61M1/16 (EP,US); A61M1/1617 (EP,KR,US); A61M1/165 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3639 (EP,KR,US); A61M1/3643 (EP,KR,US); A61M1/3644 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3649 (EP,KR,US); A61M1/365 (EP,KR,US); A61M1/3653 (EP,KR,US);
A61M1/3656 (EP,KR,US); A61M1/3659 (EP,KR,US); A61M1/3661 (EP,KR,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,KR,US); A61M2205/3344 (EP,KR,US); A61M2205/52 (EP,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/33]
TitleGerman:HÄMODIALYSATOR[2010/33]
English:HEMODIALYSIS APPARATUS[2010/33]
French:APPAREIL D'HÉMODIALYSE[2010/33]
Entry into regional phase12.05.2010Translation filed 
01.06.2010National basic fee paid 
01.06.2010Search fee paid 
01.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
02.09.2013Application withdrawn by applicant  [2013/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]JPS54153689  (CHINO WORKS LTD, et al);
 [A]US5711883  (FOLDEN THOMAS I [US], et al);
 [A]JPH11253550  (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH);
 [A]JP2003175101  (AKSYS LTD);
 [A]JP2003180823  (KITA KYUSHU BIOPHYSICS KENKYUS, et al);
 [A]JP2005218709  (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD);
 [A]JP2007282928  (ASAHI KASEI MEDICAL CO LTD)
by applicantJP2005218709
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.