Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2217748

EP2217748 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A WIND TURBINE BLADE AND USE OF A STRUCTURAL MAT FOR REINFORCING A WIND TURBINE BLADE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/33]A STRUCTURAL MAT FOR REINFORCING A WIND TURBINE BLADE STRUCTURE, A WIND TURBINE BLADE AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A WIND TURBINE BLADE
[2011/14]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.08.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
10.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 42
8200 Aarhus N / DK
[2015/23]
Former [2011/50]For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Hedeager 44
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Former [2010/33]For all designated states
Vestas Wind Systems A/S
Alsvej 21
8940 Randers SV / DK
Inventor(s)01 / HEDGES, Andrew
22 Malmesbury Road
Southampton SO15 5FR / GB
02 / VRONSKY, Tomas
13 Church Road
Woolston Southampton SO19 9FR / GB
 [2010/33]
Representative(s)Kent, Peter Joseph
Keltie LLP
No.1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/01]Kent, Peter Joseph
Keltie LLP Fleet Place House 2 Fleet Place
London EC4M 7ET / GB
Former [2012/42]Swabe, Benjamin
Vestas Wind Systems A/S IPR Department Hedeager 42
8200 Aarhus N / DK
Former [2011/38]Jeppesen, Jens
Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Former [2010/33]Jeppesen, Jens
Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31
8000 Aarhus C / DK
Application number, filing date08848052.007.11.2008
[2010/33]
WO2008DK00392
Priority number, dateDK2007000158709.11.2007         Original published format: DK 200701587
[2010/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009059604
Date:14.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2217748
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009
[2010/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2217748
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:D03D15/02, B29C70/08, B29C70/34
[2010/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WINDTURBINENBLATTS UND VERWENDUNG EINER LASTTRAGENDEN MATTE ZUR ARMIERUNG EINER WINDTURBINENBLATTKONSTRUKTION[2011/14]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A WIND TURBINE BLADE AND USE OF A STRUCTURAL MAT FOR REINFORCING A WIND TURBINE BLADE STRUCTURE[2011/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PALE D'ÉOLIENNE ET UTILISATION D'UNE NAPPE STRUCTURALE DESTINÉE À RENFORCER UNE STRUCTURE DE PALE D'ÉOLIENNE[2011/14]
Former [2010/33]LASTTRAGENDE MATTE ZUR ARMIERUNG EINER WINDTURBINENBLATTKONSTRUKTION, WINDTURBINENBLATT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WINDTURBINENBLATTS
Former [2010/33]A STRUCTURAL MAT FOR REINFORCING A WIND TURBINE BLADE STRUCTURE, A WIND TURBINE BLADE AND A METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A WIND TURBINE BLADE
Former [2010/33]NAPPE STRUCTURALE DESTINÉE À RENFORCER UNE STRUCTURE DE PALE D'ÉOLIENNE, PALE D'ÉOLIENNE CORRESPONDANTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PALE D'ÉOLIENNE
Entry into regional phase07.06.2010National basic fee paid 
07.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
08.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2011Fee for grant paid
03.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  21.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/31]
Opponent(s)01  21.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
ENERCON GmbH
Dreekamp 5
26605 Aurich / DE
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
27.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
06.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
06.11.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition18.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0095/16
07.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
13.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
HU21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
IE07.11.2011
LU07.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
IE07.11.2011
LU07.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/33]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
IE07.11.2011
LU07.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/29]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
IE07.11.2011
LU07.11.2011
MC30.11.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/29]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
MC30.11.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/26]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
Former [2012/18]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/13]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5716686  (BLACK MARVIN D [US]) [X] 1-19 * column 5, line 1 - line 20; figure 5 * [Y] 20-22;
 [Y]NL8104019  (JAN BOS) [Y] 20-22 * page 2, line 4 - line 38 *;
 [X]DE202005005957U  (POLYSTAL COMPOSITES GMBH [DE]; DRAHTWEBEREI PAUSA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,12-19 * figure -; claim 2 *