Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2218426

EP2218426 - OPERATION ASSIST DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.06.2015
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.07.2015  [2015/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Healthcare Holdings Co., Ltd.
2-38-5 Nishishimbashi
Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8433 / JP
[2015/16]
Former [2014/26]For all designated states
Panasonic Healthcare Co., Ltd.
2131-1 Minamigata
Toon-shi
Ehime 791-0395 / JP
Former [2010/33]For all designated states
Activelink Co., Ltd.
3-4 Hikaridai Seika-cho Souraku-gun
Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / FUJIMOTO, Hiromichi
c/o Activelink Co.; Ltd. 3-4, hikaridai, Seika-cho, Souraku-gun
Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
02 / SHIROGAUSHI, Go
c/o Activelink Co.; Ltd. 3-4, hikaridai, Seika-cho, Souraku-gun
Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
03 / UEDA, Keisuke
c/o Activelink Co.; Ltd. 3-4, hikaridai, Seika-cho, Souraku-gun
Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
04 / HORI, Motoshi
c/o Activelink Co.; Ltd. 3-4, hikaridai, Seika-cho, Souraku-gun
Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
05 / MIZUTANI, Tatsuor
c/o Activelink Co.; Ltd. 3-4, hikaridai, Seika-cho, Souraku-gun
Kyoto 619-0237 / JP
 [2010/33]
Representative(s)Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/34]Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Postfach 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Former [2010/33]Unland, Jochen Hermann
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner P.O. Box 10 60 78
28060 Bremen / DE
Application number, filing date08848304.506.11.2008
[2010/33]
WO2008JP03212
Priority number, dateJP2007028981307.11.2007         Original published format: JP 2007289813
[2010/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009060611
Date:14.05.2009
Language:JA
[2009/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2218426
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/56, A61F2/74, A61H1/02
[2010/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/33]
TitleGerman:OPERATIONSHILFSVORRICHTUNG[2010/33]
English:OPERATION ASSIST DEVICE[2010/33]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE POUR UNE INTERVENTION[2010/33]
Entry into regional phase07.05.2010Translation filed 
07.06.2010National basic fee paid 
07.06.2010Search fee paid 
07.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
17.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
01.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9111775  (KRAMER JAMES F [US]) [A] 1 * figures 2A, 2B, 3,4A, 4B *
International search[A]JP2006000294  (NORITSUGI TOSHIROU, et al);
 [A]JP2002345861  (HARADA ELECTRONICS IND);
 [A]JPS56156155  (SAITO MAKOTO, et al)
by applicantJP2001286519
 JP2001276101
 JP2006000294
    - "One example of Cerebral apoplectic hemiplegia in which superior limb functions are recovered by constrained-induced movement therapy", JPN J REHABIL MED, vol. 40, no. 12, page 2003