Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2217246

EP2217246 - USE OF OLIGOSACCHARIDES CONTAINING N-ACETYLLACTOSAMINE FOR MATURATION OF IMMUNE RESPONSES IN NEONATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Change - applicantpublished on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2010/33]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / FICHOT, Marie-Claire
Chemin du Péage 27
CH-1807 Blonay / CH
02 / SPRENGER, Norbert
Chemin de la Séchaude 18
CH-1073 Savigny / CH
 [2010/33]
Representative(s)Plougmann Vingtoft a/s
Strandvejen 70
2900 Hellerup / DK
[N/P]
Former [2013/47]Fraisse, Sandrine , et al
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2013/44]Fraisse, Sandrine
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2010/33]Corticchiato, Olivier
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date08848466.207.11.2008
[2010/33]
WO2008EP65143
Priority number, dateEP2007012026508.11.2007         Original published format: EP 07120265
[2010/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009060073
Date:14.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2217246
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2009
[2010/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2217246
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/7028, A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A23L1/308, A61P37/04, A61P37/08, A61K45/06, A23L1/09, A61K35/74
[2014/31]
Former International [2010/33]A61K31/7028, A23L1/29, A23L1/30, A23L1/308, A61P37/04, A61P37/08, A61K45/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/33]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON OLIGOSACCHARIDEN ENTHALTEND N-ACETYL-LACTOSAMIN ZUR MODULATION DER IMMUNREAKTION VON NEUGEBORENEN[2014/31]
English:USE OF OLIGOSACCHARIDES CONTAINING N-ACETYLLACTOSAMINE FOR MATURATION OF IMMUNE RESPONSES IN NEONATES[2010/33]
French:UTILISATION DU N-ACÉTYL-LACTOSAMINE OU D'OLIGOSACCHARIDES CONTENANT DU N-ACÉTYL-LACTOSAMINE POUR LA MODULATION DE RÉPONSES IMMUNES CHEZ LES NOUVEAUX-NÉS[2014/31]
Former [2010/33]VERWENDUNG VON OLIGOSACCHARIDEN MIT N-ACETYLLACTOSAMIN ZUR ENTWICKLUNG VON IMMUNREAKTIONEN BEI NEUGEBORENEN
Former [2010/33]MATURATION DE RÉPONSES IMMUNES DANS LES NOUVEAUX NÉS
Entry into regional phase08.06.2010National basic fee paid 
08.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
17.07.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
06.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.2014Fee for grant paid
25.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  14.09.2015  17.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
 02  17.09.2015  22.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
 [N/P]
Former [2015/44]
Opponent(s)01  14.09.2015  17.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
 02  17.09.2015  22.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
N.V. Nutricia
Eerste Stationsstraat 186
2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL
Opponent's representative
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2015/43]
Opponent(s)01  14.09.2015  17.09.2015  ADMISSIBLE
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park IL 60064 / US
Opponent's representative
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
26.10.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.07.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.03.2017
23.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
11.05.2017Date of oral proceedings
16.06.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.06.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition25.08.2017Appeal received No.  T1683/17
26.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
27.07.2017Appeal received No.  T1683/17
16.10.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
10.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.11.2008
AT17.12.2014
BG17.12.2014
CY17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
MT17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
IE07.11.2015
LU07.11.2015
PL07.11.2017
[2019/22]
Former [2017/39]HU07.11.2008
AT17.12.2014
BG17.12.2014
CY17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
MT17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
IE07.11.2015
LU07.11.2015
Former [2016/45]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
IE07.11.2015
LU07.11.2015
Former [2016/31]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
LU07.11.2015
Former [2016/28]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
MC17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
Former [2016/12]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SI17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
Former [2015/50]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
DK17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
Former [2015/38]AT17.12.2014
CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
IS17.04.2015
Former [2015/37]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
SK17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/36]CZ17.12.2014
EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
RO17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/35]EE17.12.2014
HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/24]HR17.12.2014
LT17.12.2014
LV17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT17.12.2014
NO17.03.2015
Former [2015/20]LT17.12.2014
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO2007105945  (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9 * page 1, lines 5,6,25-32 * * page 2, lines 11-29 * * page 3, lines 26-29 * * page 4, lines 19-22 * * page 5, lines 1-15 * * page 7, lines 1-8 * * page 8, lines 6-26 * * page 9, lines 11-25 * * page 10, line 13 - page 11, line 24 * * page 12, lines 14-22 * * page 16, lines 7-16 * * claims 1-4,6-8 * [A] 2;
 [X]WO9843494  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, lines 7-10,20-24 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraphs 3,10 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * examples 3,5-8 * * claim 1 *;
 [XA]WO2004002495  (BIOTIE THERAPIES OYJ [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * page 8, line 13 - page 9, line 9 * * page 85, line 6 - page 86, line 15 * * page 86, lines 30-32 * * page 94, lines 8-35 * * page 95, lines 11-16,30-34 * * claims 1,32,44,45,65 * [A] 7,8;
 [X]US2005004070  (STAHL BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * page 1, paragraphs 1,13 * * page 2, paragraphs 26,27 * * page 3, paragraphs 32,35 * * example 6 * * claims 4,8,13 *;
 [X]US4919961  (LUNDBLAD ARNE [SE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * column 1, line 38 - column 2, line 13 * * example 1 * * claims 1,4 *;
 [X]WO9843495  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 13 * * page 4, lines 6-13 * * page 6, lines 1-4,14-25 * * page 13, lines 14-16 * * claims 1,3,11,17 *;
 [X]US6204431  (PRIETO PEDRO A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * column 2, lines 18-23 * * column 4, lines 3-9 * * column 6, lines 18-32 * * column 7, lines 42-49 * * column 9, lines 2-15,27-39 * * claims 13,17 *;
 [X]US2003129278  (STAHL BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * page 1, paragraphs 1,3-6,9-12 * * page 3, paragraphs 26,27 * * example 5 * * claims 7-9 *;
 [X]WO02056893  (CARBION OY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,10 * page 2, lines 24-35 * * page 16, line 21 - page 17, line 14 * * page 22, lines 8-14 * * page 23, line 35 - page 24, line 21 * * claims 1,3,5,13,14,16,17 *;
 [X]WO2005067962  (PULEVA BIOTECH SA [ES], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * page 1, lines 5-10,21-26 * * page 7, lines 14-21 * * page 10, lines 24-33 * * page 11, lines 11-13 * * examples 3,4,6,9 * * claims 1,2,11,14,18,19 *;
 [A]WO2004112509  (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 7,8 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 3, lines 1-9,19-29 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, lines 13,14 * * page 7, line 32 - page 8, line 16 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, line 31 - page 11, line 3 * * page 11, lines 24-29 * * examples 2,3 * * claims 1,3-5,12,13 *;
 [A]WO2006113035  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US], et al) [A] 7,8 * page 7, paragraph 23 * * page 9, paragraphs 41,42 * * page 9, paragraph 48 - page 10, paragraph 52 * * page 11, paragraph 56 * * page 12, paragraph 61 - page 13, paragraph 64 * * claims 1,5,7-15 *;
 [A]EP1062873  (NUTRICIA NV [NL]) [A] 1-6,8-10 * page 2, paragraphs 7,8 * * page 3, paragraphs 19,20 * * page 6, paragraph 49 * * page 11, paragraphs 108,110,113,114 * * example 3 * * claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2007104311  (GLYCOM APS [DK], et al) [A] * page 3, lines 6-11 * * page 17, lines 5,6,9,15 *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "Aptamil", INTERNET CITATION, (20040116), URL: http://www.milupa.ch/images/prebiotica_pressemitteilung.pdf, (20061219), XP002412131 [A] 8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - KUNZ C, "Complex oligosaccharides in infant nutrition", MONATSSCHRIFT FUR KINDERHEILKUNDE 1998 DE, (1998), vol. 146, no. 8 SUPPL. 1, ISSN 0026-9298, pages S49 - S56, XP002473723 [A] 1-6,8-10 * abstract * * table 3 * * page S55, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/PL00014766
Examination   - RINNE ET AL, "Effect of Probiotics and Breastfeeding on the Bifidobacterium and Lactobacillus/Enterococcus Microbiota and Humoral Immune Responses", JOURNAL OF PEDIATRICS, MOSBY-YEAR BOOK, ST. LOUIS, MO, US, (20050801), vol. 147, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JPEDS.2005.03.053, ISSN 0022-3476, pages 186 - 191, XP005692247

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpeds.2005.03.053
Opposition   - Norbert Sprenger, Le Ye Lee, Carlos Antonio De Castro, Philippe Steenhout, Sagar K. Thakkar, "Longitudinal change of selected human milk oligosaccharides and association to infants' growth, an observatory, single center, longitudinal cohort study", Plos ONE, (20170209), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 1 - 15, XP055364475

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0171814
    - European Food Safety Authority, "Safety of lacto- N -neotetraose as a novel food ingredient pursuant to Regulation (EC) No 258/97", EFSA Journal, (20150700), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 4183-1 - 4183-32, XP055364478

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2903/j.efsa.2015.4183
    - European Food Safety Authority, "Safety of 2′-O-fucosyllactose as a novel food ingredient pursuant to Regulation (EC) No 258/97", EFSA Journal, (20150700), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 4184-1 - 4184-32, XP055364481

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2903/j.efsa.2015.4184