Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2219416

EP2219416 - LIGHT TRANSMITTING SUBSTRATE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT TRANSMITTING SUBSTRATE, ORGANIC LED ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ORGANIC LED ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.10.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asahi Glass Company, Limited
Shin-Marunouchi Building
1-5-1 Marunouchi
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
[2011/43]
Former [2010/33]For all designated states
Asahi Glass Co., Ltd.
12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAKAMURA, Nobuhiro
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD.
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
02 / ONO, Motoshi
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD.
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
03 / IMAKITA, Kenji
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD.
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
04 / ODAKA, Hidefumi
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD.
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
05 / ISHIBASHI, Nao
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD.
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
06 / HAYASHI, Kazutaka
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD.
12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
 [2018/07]
Former [2010/33]01 / NAKAMURA, Nobuhiro
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD. 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
02 / ONO, Motoshi
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD. 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
03 / IMAKITA, Kenji
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD. 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
04 / ODAKA, Hidefumi
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD. 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
05 / ISHIBASHI, Nao
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD. 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
06 / HAYASHI, Kazutaka
c/o ASAHI GLASS CO. LTD. 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8405 / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2018/07]
Former [2010/33]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Straße 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date08848564.406.11.2008
[2010/33]
WO2008JP70239
Priority number, dateJP2007029252209.11.2007         Original published format: JP 2007292522
[2010/33]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009060916
Date:14.05.2009
Language:JA
[2009/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2219416
Date:18.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2219416
Date:14.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP14.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01L51/52, H01L51/56, H05B33/10, H05B33/22
[2013/08]
Former International [2010/33]H05B33/02, H01B5/14, H01L51/50, H05B33/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/07]
Former [2010/33]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:LICHTDURCHLÄSSIGES SUBSTRAT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LICHTDURCHLÄSSIGEN SUBSTRATS, ORGANISCHES LED-ELEMENT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ORGANISCHES LED-ELEMENTS[2010/33]
English:LIGHT TRANSMITTING SUBSTRATE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING LIGHT TRANSMITTING SUBSTRATE, ORGANIC LED ELEMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ORGANIC LED ELEMENT[2010/33]
French:SUBSTRAT TRANSMETTANT LA LUMIÈRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SUBSTRAT TRANSMETTANT LA LUMIÈRE, ÉLÉMENT DE DEL ORGANIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE DEL ORGANIQUE[2010/33]
Entry into regional phase05.05.2010Translation filed 
12.05.2010National basic fee paid 
12.05.2010Search fee paid 
12.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
12.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/33]
05.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2015Observations by third parties
17.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2017Observations by third parties
16.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.12.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.12.2017Fee for grant paid
28.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.04.2015
Opposition(s)15.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
22.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SI14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
[2019/13]
Former [2018/51]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
DK14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
CZ14.02.2018
EE14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
PL14.02.2018
RO14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
SK14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
IT14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
LV14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
SE14.02.2018
BG14.05.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/38]AT14.02.2018
CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
GR15.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY14.02.2018
ES14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY14.02.2018
FI14.02.2018
HR14.02.2018
LT14.02.2018
NL14.02.2018
NO14.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[EL]EP2178343  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-17 * the whole document * * (L: Priority) * [L] 1-17;
 [XI]US2006186801  (WEST JAMES A [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9,10,16,17 * abstract * * figures 1-16 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0102] * [I] 2,6,8,11,13,15;
 [XDA]JP2006222028  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [XD] 16,17 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0055] * [A] 1,3,4,7-9,11,13;
 [D]JP2005063704  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [D] * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004207314  (AITKEN BRUCE G [US], et al) [A] 1,13,16,17 * abstract * * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0076] *;
 [A]WO0237580  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *
International search[Y]JP2005063704  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2004319331  (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP);
 [Y]JP2006222028  (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD);
 [Y]JP2007065523  (HITACHI DISPLAYS LTD);
 [Y]JP2007059195  (FUJIFILM HOLDINGS CORP);
 [Y]JP2005251489  (HITACHI LTD, et al);
 [Y]JP2005190838  (OPTREX KK, et al);
 [Y]JP2007141728  (TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TEC);
 [Y]JP2004513483  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO.)
by applicantJP2931211B
 JP2005063704
 JP2005190931
 JP2004513483
 JP2004513484
 JP2007141728
 JP2006222028
 JP2005038681
otherEP2178343
    - "ISO 4287 Geometrical Product Specifications (GPS) Surface texture: Profile method Terms, definitions and surface texture parameters", ISO 4287, pages 1 - 42, XP008142806