Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2209696

EP2209696 - A B-PILLAR FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2016
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gestamp HardTech AB
P.O. Box 828
971 25 Luleå / SE
[2010/30]
Inventor(s)01 / BODIN, Hans
Tunnlandsvägen 8
S-954 42 Södra Sunderbyn / SE
02 / BERGLUND, Daniel
Tullnäsvägen 21
S-945 31 Norrfjärden / SE
 [2010/30]
Representative(s)Roth, Sebastian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2010/30]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date08849349.912.11.2008
[2010/30]
WO2008SE00638
Priority number, dateSE2007000251315.11.2007         Original published format: SE 0702513
[2010/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009064236
Date:22.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2209696
Date:28.07.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009
[2010/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2209696
Date:08.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE22.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:B62D25/04, B62D29/00
[2010/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/30]
TitleGerman:B-SÄULE FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG[2010/30]
English:A B-PILLAR FOR A VEHICLE[2010/30]
French:MONTANT MILIEU POUR UN VÉHICULE[2010/30]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2010National basic fee paid 
14.05.2010Search fee paid 
14.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/30]
03.06.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.10.2013Fee for grant paid
11.10.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.06.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.10.2014  10.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
voestalpine Metal Forming GmbH
Schmidhüttenstrasse 5
3500 Krems an der Donau / AT
Opponent's representative
HGF Europe LLP
Neumarkter Str. 18
81673 München / DE
 02  08.10.2014  14.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
 03  08.10.2014  14.10.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH
An der Talle 27-31
33102 Paderborn / DE
Opponent's representative
Ksoll, Peter
Bockermann Ksoll
Griepenstroh Osterhoff
Patentanwälte
Bergstrasse 159
44791 Bochum / DE
 [2019/21]
Former [2014/46]
Opponent(s)01  06.10.2014   
voestalpine Metal Forming GmbH
Schmidhüttenstrasse 5
3500 Krems an der Donau / AT
Opponent's representative
Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Neumarkter Strasse 18
81673 München / DE
 02  08.10.2014   
Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft
Petuelring 130
80809 München / DE
 03  08.10.2014   
Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH
An der Talle 27-31
33102 Paderborn / DE
Opponent's representative
Ksoll, Peter
Bockermann Ksoll
Griepenstroh Osterhoff
Patentanwälte
Bergstrasse 159
44791 Bochum / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
14.11.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.05.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
09.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.12.2016Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition03.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0098/17
13.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0098/17
10.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
12.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0098/17
07.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
29.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
MT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
TR08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2016/28]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
GR09.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/46]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
IE12.11.2014
LU12.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/33]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU12.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
Former [2015/32]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
MC08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU12.11.2014
Former [2015/30]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
LU12.11.2014
Former [2015/24]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
SI08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
DK08.01.2014
EE08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
HR08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
LV08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/39]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
NL08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/37]AT08.01.2014
CY08.01.2014
FI08.01.2014
LT08.01.2014
SE08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
PT08.05.2014
Former [2014/36]LT08.01.2014
NO08.04.2014
IS08.05.2014
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002104591  (GEHRINGHOFF LUDGER [DE], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]US2004201256  (CALISKAN ARI GARO [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040]; figure - *;
 [A]US7077920  (GEHRINGHOFF LUDGER [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]US2002104591  (GEHRINGHOFF LUDGER [DE], et al);
 [A]US2004201256  (CALISKAN ARI GARO [US], et al);
 [A]US7077920  (GEHRINGHOFF LUDGER [DE])