Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2220333

EP2220333 - FLEXIBLE PIPE SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 17.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.05.2018Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: LV
published on 13.06.2018  [2018/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Oil & Gas UK Limited
2, High Street
Nailsea Bristol
BS48 1BS / GB
[2017/40]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
GE Oil & Gas UK Limited
2, High Street
Nailsea Bristol
BS48 1BS / GB
Former [2010/34]For all designated states
Wellstream International Limited
Wellstream House Wincomblee Road Walker Riverside
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE6 3PF / GB
Inventor(s)01 / TAN, Zhimin
Wellstream International Limited
11210 Equity Drive
Suite 350
Houston, TX 77041 / US
02 / POWELL, Michael, David
Wellstream International Limited
11210 Equity Drive
Suite 350
Houston, TX 77041 / US
03 / ZHANG, Yanqiu
Wellstream International Limited
11210 Equity Drive
Suite 350
Houston, TX 77041 / US
04 / KOLANSKI, Thomas
Wellstream International Limited
11210 Equity Drive
Suite 350
Houston, TX 77041 / US
 [2013/17]
Former [2010/44]01 / TAN, Zhimin
Wellstream International Limited 11210 Equity Drive Suite 350
Houston, TX 77041 / US
02 / POWELL, Michael, David
Wellstream International Limited 11210 Equity Drive Suite 350
Houston, TX 77041 / US
03 / ZHANG, Yanqiu
Wellstream International Limited 11210 Equity Drive Suite 350
Houston, TX 77041 / US
04 / KOLANSKI, Thomas
Wellstream International Limited 11210 Equity Drive Suite 350
Houston, TX 77041 / US
Former [2010/34]01 / TAN, Zhimin
Wellstream International Limited One Briarlake Plaza 2000 West Sam Houston South Suite 650
Houston, TX 77042-3611 / US
02 / POWELL, Michael, David
Wellstream International Limited One Briarlake Plaza 2000 West Sam Houston South Suite 650
Houston, TX 77042-3611 / US
03 / ZHANG, Yanqiu
Wellstream International Limited One Briarlake Plaza 2000 West Sam Houston South Suite 650
Houston, TX 77042-3611 / US
04 / KOLANSKI, Thomas
Wellstream International Limited One Briarlake Plaza 2000 West Sam Houston South Suite 650
Houston, TX 77042-3611 / US
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[2017/40]
Former [2013/17]Uno, Jennifer Elizabeth Hayes , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York, YO1 8NQ / GB
Former [2011/15]Uno, Jennifer Elizabeth Hayes , et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York
YO1 6JX / GB
Former [2010/34]Boakes, Jason Carrington
Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate
York, Yorkshire YO1 6JX / GB
Application number, filing date08849638.520.10.2008
[2010/34]
WO2008GB03550
Priority number, dateGB2007002245916.11.2007         Original published format: GB 0722459
[2010/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009063163
Date:22.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2220333
Date:25.08.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009
[2010/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2220333
Date:24.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/17]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2220333
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:E21B17/01
[2010/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/40]
Former [2010/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLE ROHRSTÜTZE[2010/34]
English:FLEXIBLE PIPE SUPPORT[2010/34]
French:SUPPORT POUR TUYAU FLEXIBLE[2010/34]
Entry into regional phase14.05.2010National basic fee paid 
14.05.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
14.05.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/34]
18.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.05.2011Observations by third parties
07.09.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.03.2013Fee for grant paid
11.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.01.2014  30.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Technip France
6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Earnshaw, Geoffrey Mark
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
 [2015/33]
Former [2014/09]
Opponent(s)01  22.01.2014   
Technip France
6-8, Allée de l'Arche, Faubourg de l'Arche, ZAC Danton
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Opponent's representative
Lawal, Abdulmalik Adinoyi
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow, Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB
04.03.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.09.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.10.2016Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
05.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.01.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
26.06.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.08.2017Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition30.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0822/17
03.05.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
21.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.10.2008
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE20.10.2013
LU20.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
NO31.10.2016
[2018/24]
Former [2017/42]HU20.10.2008
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE20.10.2013
LU20.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
NO31.10.2016
Former [2015/41]HU20.10.2008
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
MT24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE20.10.2013
LU20.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
Former [2015/34]HU20.10.2008
AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE20.10.2013
LU20.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
Former [2015/32]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
TR24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE20.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
Former [2014/48]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
IE20.10.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
Former [2014/38]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
DE01.05.2014
Former [2014/34]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
CH31.10.2013
LI31.10.2013
Former [2014/25]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
MC24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/14]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
NL24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/11]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
IT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
RO24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
CZ24.04.2013
EE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
SK24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
CY24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/51]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
HR24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
LV24.04.2013
PL24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
BG24.07.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT24.04.2013
BE24.04.2013
FI24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
SE24.04.2013
SI24.04.2013
GR25.07.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT24.04.2013
LT24.04.2013
ES04.08.2013
IS24.08.2013
PT26.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT24.04.2013
PT26.08.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2173160  (AMTEL INC) [X] 1-19 * page 1, lines 102-113; figure 2 * * page 3, lines 39-46 *;
 [Y]US6200180  (HOOPER ALAN G [SG]) [Y] 1-19 * column 3, lines 18-23; figure 1 *;
 [X]EP0396391  (FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-19 * column 6, lines 31-47; figures 10,11 *;
 [Y]WO03031765  (SUBSEA 7 LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 31, lines 9-23 *
otherEP1022501
 GB1534252
 GB2377002
 GB2404428
 US4363566
 US4459065
OppositionWO9966169
 US2005158126
 WO2007017574
 US4263004
 US4063430
 US6200180
 US4110994
 EP1022501
 GB1534252
 GB2377002
 US4459065
 US4363566