EP2209815 - HYBRID COMPOUNDS CONTAINING POLYSACCHARIDE(S) AND AT LEAST ONE POLYOXYALKYLENE, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Opérations 40, Rue de La Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | For all designated states Institut National des Sciences Appliquées de Lyon 20 Avenue Albert Einstein 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | For all designated states Rhodia Opérations 40 Rue de La Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut National des Sciences Appliquées de Lyon 20 Avenue Albert Einstein 69100 Villeurbanne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLEURY, Etienne 26 rue Taillepied F-69540 Irigny / FR | 02 /
TIZZOTTI, Morgan 15 HLM Le Nouveau Logis 918 rue René Cassin F-83150 Bandol / FR | 03 /
DESTARAC, Mathias 10 rue Tolosane F-31000 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
LABEAU, Marie-Pierre 45 Clydesdale Drive Burlington New Jersey 08016 / US | 05 /
HAMAIDE, Thierry 11 Jardins de Saint Benoit F-38200 Vienne / FR | 06 /
DROCKENMULLER, Eric 19 rue du Professeur Sisley F-69003 Lyon / FR | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/15] |
Former [2011/15] | Cordier, Pascal Christian, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/37] | Cordier, Pascal Christian, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/30] | Seugnet, Jean Louis, et al RHODIA Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08849976.9 | 14.11.2008 | [2010/30] | WO2008EP65619 | Priority number, date | FR20070059116 | 16.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0759116 | [2010/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009063082 | Date: | 22.05.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2209815 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08B37/00, C08G81/00 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
C08G81/00 (EP,US);
C08B37/0096 (EP,US);
C08G65/325 (EP,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L5/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | HYBRIDVERBINDUNGEN MIT POLYSACCHARIDEN UND MINDESTENS EINEM POLYOXYALKYLEN, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2010/30] | English: | HYBRID COMPOUNDS CONTAINING POLYSACCHARIDE(S) AND AT LEAST ONE POLYOXYALKYLENE, METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME, AND APPLICATIONS THEREOF | [2010/30] | French: | COMPOSÉS HYBRIDES À BASE DE POLYSACCHARIDE(S) ET D'AU MOINS UN POLYOXYALKYLÈNE, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET LEURS APPLICATIONS. | [2010/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/30] | 03.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 03.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y] - LUTZ ET AL, "Modern trends in polymer bioconjugates design", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20070821), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0079-6700, pages 1 - 39, XP022393257 [Y] 1-21 *2.5. Common synthetic polymers used in bioconjugation, pages 8-9* *4.1. Bioconjugation by coupling, pages 13-14* *4.1.4. "Click" chemistry, pages 18-20* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2007.07.005 | [Y] - EGAWA ET AL, "'Click chemistry' on polysaccharides: a convenient, general, and monitorable approach to develop (1->3)-beta-d-glucans with various functional appendages", BOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060116), vol. 341, no. 1, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 35 - 40, XP005213174 [Y] 1-21 * page 36 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2005.10.009 | [Y] - TANKAM ET AL, "Alkynyl polysaccharides: synthesis of propargyl potato starch followed by subsequent derivatizations", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070731), vol. 342, no. 14, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 2049 - 2060, XP022182228 [Y] 1-21 *scheme 2* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2007.05.017 | [Y] - TANKAM ET AL, "Modification of methyl O-propargyl-d-glucosides: model studies for the synthesis of alkynyl based functional polysaccharides", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070731), vol. 342, no. 14, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 2031 - 2048, XP022182227 [Y] 1-21 * table 1 * *scheme 2, 3* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.carres.2007.05.007 | [DY] - T LIEBERT, C HÄNSCH, T HEINZE, "Click Chemistry with Polysaccharides", MACROMOL. RAPID COMMUNIC., (2006), vol. 27, pages 208 - 213, XP002483297 [DY] 1-21 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/marc.200500686 |