Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2220689 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2220689



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 6891
07.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
31.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.10.2019 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
24.10.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) Opposition 3
23.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) Opposition 3
23.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) Opposition 3
23.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) Opposition 3
23.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) Opposition 3
23.10.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings (Legal Division) Opposition 3
23.10.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 2
15.10.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
04.10.2019 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 6
27.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.09.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
27.09.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.09.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 16
27.09.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
27.09.2019 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
27.09.2019 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
27.09.2019 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
20.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
20.09.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 4
20.09.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 4
20.09.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 7
20.09.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 7
20.09.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
20.09.2019 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 3
06.09.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
06.09.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
06.09.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
30.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
27.08.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
27.08.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
27.08.2019 F3203 Composition of the Board (J) Appeal 1
23.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
23.08.2019 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
19.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.08.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
19.08.2019 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
09.08.2019 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
09.08.2019 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
31.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
31.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
31.07.2019 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
31.07.2019 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
24.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
24.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.07.2019 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 372
10.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 372
10.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 372
10.07.2019 Communication of notices of intervention Opposition 371
02.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
02.07.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
02.07.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
02.07.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 31
02.07.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 19
02.07.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
02.07.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 22
02.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 211
02.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 211
02.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 211
02.07.2019 Communication of notices of intervention Opposition 210
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 57
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 49
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
02.07.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
02.07.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
02.07.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 34
02.07.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
02.07.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
02.07.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
02.07.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
01.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 169
01.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 169
01.07.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 169
01.07.2019 Communication of notices of intervention Opposition 168
24.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
24.06.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 13
24.06.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
24.06.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 36
24.06.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
24.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 25
14.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.06.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 32
14.06.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
14.06.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
14.06.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.06.2019 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
14.06.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 30
14.06.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
14.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
14.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 37
14.06.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
03.06.2019 Request for oral proceedings Opposition 1
31.05.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 11
31.05.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 11
31.05.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 11
31.05.2019 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 11
25.02.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.02.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.02.2019 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 51
04.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 51
04.02.2019 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 51
01.02.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
11.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 1
11.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
11.01.2019 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.01.2019 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
09.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
09.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 32
09.01.2019 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 12
09.01.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
09.01.2019 Refund of fees Opposition 1
09.01.2019 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 2
08.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 3
07.01.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
31.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.12.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
20.12.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 17
20.12.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.12.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.12.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.12.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.12.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
20.12.2018 Refund of fees Appeal 1
05.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.12.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.11.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
30.11.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
30.11.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
27.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.11.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
21.11.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
04.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
04.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
04.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
04.10.2018 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 3
22.08.2018 Authorisation of representative Appeal 2
22.08.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 1
01.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
01.08.2018 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 3
31.07.2018 Brief communication to applicant Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Brief communication to third party Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Brief communication to third party Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Brief communication to third party Search / examination 1
31.07.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Search / examination 3
18.07.2018 Annex Search / examination 6
18.07.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Search / examination 1
17.07.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.07.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 6
02.07.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
02.07.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
02.07.2018 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 4
29.06.2018 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
29.06.2018 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
29.06.2018 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
29.06.2018 F3326 Communication with time limit (inter partes) Appeal 6
05.06.2018 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
29.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
29.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
29.05.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 4
25.05.2018 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
25.05.2018 Communication of amended entries Appeal 2
23.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2018 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Opposition 3
17.05.2018 Request concerning representative opponent Appeal 3
07.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
07.05.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 8
07.05.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 8
27.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
27.03.2018 Annex Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Annex Appeal 2
27.03.2018 Annex Appeal 2
27.03.2018 Annex Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
27.03.2018 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
27.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
27.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
27.03.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 2
27.03.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 2
08.03.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
08.03.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
08.03.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 4
08.03.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
08.03.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 2
08.03.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 4
08.03.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 4
08.03.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 4
06.03.2018 Note on telephone consultation Appeal 1
06.03.2018 Note on telephone consultation Opposition 1
14.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.02.2018 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Appeal 2
13.02.2018 Note on telephone consultation Appeal 1
13.02.2018 Note on telephone consultation Opposition 1
25.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
25.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.01.2018 Annex Opposition 1
25.01.2018 Annex Appeal 1
25.01.2018 Annex Opposition 19
25.01.2018 Annex Appeal 19
25.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
25.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
25.01.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 5
25.01.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 5
24.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
24.01.2018 Annex Opposition 16
24.01.2018 Annex Appeal 16
24.01.2018 Authorisation of representative Appeal 1
24.01.2018 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
24.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
24.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
24.01.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 2
24.01.2018 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 2
16.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
16.01.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
15.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
15.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
15.01.2018 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Appeal 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
04.01.2018 Brief communication to third party Opposition 1
04.01.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 3
04.01.2018 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 3
20.12.2017 Annex Opposition 20
20.12.2017 Annex Appeal 20
24.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.11.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
07.11.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
07.11.2017 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.11.2017 Communication from the Legal Division Appeal 2
07.11.2017 Communication from the Legal Division Opposition 2
06.11.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
06.11.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
06.11.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 2
06.11.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 17
06.11.2017 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.11.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.11.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
06.11.2017 Means of redress Opposition 2
06.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
06.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
06.11.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
06.11.2017 OPPODREX with handwritten amendments Opposition 9
06.11.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
06.11.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.11.2017 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 8
25.10.2017 Annex Opposition 16
25.10.2017 Annex Appeal 16
25.10.2017 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 1
25.10.2017 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 1
23.10.2017 Letter to the Legal Division Appeal 1
23.10.2017 Letter to the Legal Division Opposition 1
12.09.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 9
08.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.09.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
07.09.2017 Annex Opposition 3
07.09.2017 Claims Opposition 3
07.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
07.09.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.08.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
17.08.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Opposition 2
08.08.2017 Request concerning the applicant/representative Opposition 2
26.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
24.07.2017 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Opposition 2
24.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
24.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 4
13.07.2017 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
12.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
11.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 4
11.07.2017 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Opposition 13
11.07.2017 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
11.07.2017 Authorisation of representative Opposition 2
11.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.07.2017 Claims Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Claims Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Claims Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Claims Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Claims Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Claims Opposition 3
11.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.07.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.07.2017 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 9
11.07.2017 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
11.07.2017 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Opposition 2
11.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
10.07.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
10.07.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
10.07.2017 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.07.2017 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.06.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.06.2017 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
14.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
13.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.02.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.02.2017 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.02.2017 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
23.12.2016 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 3
23.12.2016 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
23.12.2016 Letter which had not been notified Opposition 16
19.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.12.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
14.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
13.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.12.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
09.12.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
09.12.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.12.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
06.12.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Withdrawal of an opposition Opposition 2
01.12.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 2
21.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
21.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
21.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
18.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
15.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
15.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
15.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
10.11.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.11.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.05.2016 Document concerning representation Opposition 2
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
26.02.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Amended claims with annotations Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Claims Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
26.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
26.02.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
26.02.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 38
19.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
19.02.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 3
18.02.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
17.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
12.02.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.12.2015 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
16.12.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.12.2015 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.10.2015 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
29.09.2015 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 2
26.08.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.08.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
24.08.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
20.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 77
20.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.07.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.07.2015 Request for documents Opposition 1
15.07.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
15.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
15.07.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
15.07.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
11.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
11.06.2015 Request for documents Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 116
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
05.06.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
04.06.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
04.06.2015 Request for documents Opposition 1
02.06.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
02.06.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
27.05.2015 Annex Opposition 2
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 77
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
27.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
27.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 27
27.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
27.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
27.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
27.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
27.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 15
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 50
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 40
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 44
27.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
27.05.2015 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
26.05.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
26.05.2015 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 28
26.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
26.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
26.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
26.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
26.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
26.05.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 21
26.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 85
26.05.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
26.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
26.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
26.05.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 43
27.08.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
31.07.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
17.07.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
17.07.2014 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
17.07.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
17.07.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
09.05.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.05.2014 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
28.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
24.04.2014 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 3
20.03.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.03.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.03.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
20.03.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
28.11.2013 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 1
27.11.2013 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
27.09.2013 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Search / examination 1
16.09.2013 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
29.07.2013 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
10.12.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 15
10.12.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.12.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
23.11.2012 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 2
19.10.2012 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
08.10.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 2
04.07.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
04.07.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
04.07.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
31.03.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
31.03.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.08.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
17.08.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
16.08.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
16.08.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
28.07.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
16.07.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
08.07.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
08.07.2010 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
08.07.2010 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.06.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.06.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 4
03.06.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
30.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
30.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
30.04.2010 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
26.03.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
10.06.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 23
22.05.2009 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 20
06.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
06.11.2008 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
06.11.2008 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
06.11.2008 Description PCT receiving Office 15
06.11.2008 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1