Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2220689

EP2220689 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SOLAR CELL WITH A SURFACE-PASSIVATING DIELECTRIC DOUBLE LAYER, AND CORRESPONDING SOLAR CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.07.2014
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Change - applicant 
25.10.2019Change - applicantpublished on 27.11.2019 [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hanwha Q Cells & Advanced Materials Corp.
86 Cheonggyecheon-ro
Seoul 04541 / KR
[2019/48]
Former [2019/46]For all designated states
Hanwha Q CELLS & Advanced Materials Corporation
79-20, Geumhoangol-gil
Bugang-myeon
Sejong-si / KR
Former [2019/10]For all designated states
Hanwha Q Cells & Advanced Materials Corp.
86 Cheonggyecheon-ro
Seoul 04541 / KR
Former [2018/20]For all designated states
SolarWorld Industries GmbH
Martin-Luther-King-Straße 24
53175 Bonn / DE
For all designated states
Hanwha Q CELLS Co., Ltd.
P.O. Box 309
Ugland House
Grand Cayman, KY1-1104 / KY
Former [2017/38]For all designated states
SolarWorld Innovations GmbH
Berthelsdorfer Straße 111A
09599 Freiberg / DE
For all designated states
Hanwha Q CELLS Co., Ltd.
P.O. Box 309
Ugland House
Grand Cayman, KY1-1104 / KY
Former [2014/35]For all designated states
Institut für Solarenergieforschung GmbH
Am Ohrberg 1
31860 Emmerthal / DE
For all designated states
Technische Universiteit Eindhoven
Den Dolech 2
5612 AZ Eindhoven / NL
Former [2014/01]For all designated states
Institut für Solarenergieforschung GmbH
Am Ohrberg 1
31860 Emmerthal / DE
For all designated states
Technische Universiteit Eindhoven
Den Dolech 2
5612 AZ Eindhoven / NL
Former [2010/34]For all designated states
Institut für Solarenergieforschung GmbH
Am Ohrberg 1
31860 Emmerthal / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SCHMIDT, Jan
Friedrich-Sander-Weg 6
31789 Hameln / DE
02 / HOEX Bram Dr.
Tanglin View
Tower C
150 Prince Charles Crescent, 15-05
159012 Singapore / SG
 [2012/47]
Former [2010/34]01 / SCHMIDT, Jan
Friedrich-Sander-Weg 6
31789 Hameln / DE
Representative(s)Peterreins Schley
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Hermann-Sack-Strasse 3
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/35]Qip Patentanwälte Dr. Kuehn & Partner mbB
Goethestraße 8
80336 München / DE
Former [2014/24]Qip Patentanwälte Dr. Kuhn & Partner mbB
Goethestraße 8
80336 München / DE
Former [2014/23]Kühn, Ralph , et al
Gautinger Strasse 13b
82234 Weßling / DE
Former [2010/34]Kühn, Ralph
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date08850615.906.11.2008
[2010/34]
WO2008EP65067
Priority number, dateDE2007105438414.11.2007         Original published format: DE102007054384
[2010/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2009062882
Date:22.05.2009
Language:DE
[2009/21]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2220689
Date:25.08.2010
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2009
[2010/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2220689
Date:27.08.2014
Language:DE
[2014/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:H01L31/18, H01L31/0216, H01L31/068
[2014/11]
Former International [2010/34]H01L31/0216, H01L23/31, H01L21/316
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER SOLARZELLE MIT EINER OBERFLÄCHENPASSIVIERENDEN DIELEKTRIKUMDOPPELSCHICHT UND ENTSPRECHENDE SOLARZELLE[2010/34]
English:METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SOLAR CELL WITH A SURFACE-PASSIVATING DIELECTRIC DOUBLE LAYER, AND CORRESPONDING SOLAR CELL[2010/34]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CELLULE SOLAIRE COMPORTANT UNE DOUBLE COUCHE DE DIÉLECTRIQUE À PASSIVATION DE SURFACE, ET CELLULE SOLAIRE CORRESPONDANTE[2010/34]
Entry into regional phase11.06.2010National basic fee paid 
11.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
11.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/34]
16.08.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2014Fee for grant paid
17.07.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 32 01 39
01013 Dresden / DE
 03  27.05.2015  05.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 06  14.06.2019   
REC Solar EMEA GmbH
Leopoldstr. 175
80804 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
 07  24.06.2019   
JinkoSolar GmbH
Freisinger Strasse 9
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Olswang Germany LLP
Promenadeplatz 12
80333 Munich / DE
 08  02.07.2019   
LONGi Solar Technologie GmbH
Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 41
60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
 [2019/32]
Former [2019/31]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 32 01 39
01013 Dresden / DE
 03  27.05.2015  05.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 06  14.06.2019   
REC Solar EMEA GmbH
Leopoldstr. 175
80804 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
 07  24.06.2019   
JinkoSolar GmbH
Freisinger Strasse 9
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Olswang Germany LLP
Promenadeplatz 12
80333 Munich / DE
Former [2019/30]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 32 01 39
01013 Dresden / DE
 03  27.05.2015  05.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
 06  14.06.2019   
REC Solar EMEA GmbH
Leopoldstr. 175
80804 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Betten & Resch
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Maximiliansplatz 14
80333 München / DE
Former [2017/33]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 5117
200 71 Malmö / SE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 32 01 39
01013 Dresden / DE
 03  27.05.2015  05.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2017/30]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
Clerix, André
IMEC vzw
IP Department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  WITHDRAWN
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 32 01 39
01013 Dresden / DE
 03  27.05.2015  05.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2017/04]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
Clerix, André
IMEC vzw
IP Department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Kailuweit & Uhlemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 32 01 39
01013 Dresden / DE
 03  27.05.2015  05.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2017/02]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
Clerix, André
IMEC vzw
IP Department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Peter, et al
Peter Bittner und Partner
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
 03  27.05.2015  05.12.2016  WITHDRAWN
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2015/47]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
Clerix, André
IMEC vzw
IP Department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Peter, et al
Peter Bittner und Partner
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
 03  27.05.2015  24.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
Former [2015/29]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
Clerix, André
IMEC vzw
IP Department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
 02  27.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Peter
Peter Bittner und Partner
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
 03  27.05.2015   
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 05  27.05.2015  10.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Solaytec B.V.
Dillenburgstraat 9G
5652 AM Eindhoven / NL
Opponent's representative
Jansen, Cornelis Marinus
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Former [2015/28]
Opponent(s)01  26.05.2015  03.06.2015  ADMISSIBLE
IMEC VZW
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
Opponent's representative
Clerix, André
IMEC vzw
IP Department
Kapeldreef 75
3001 Leuven / BE
 02  27.05.2015   
Bittner, Peter
c/o Peter Bittner und Partner European Patent Atto
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Bittner, Peter
Peter Bittner und Partner
Seegarten 24
69190 Walldorf / DE
 03  27.05.2015   
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
 04  27.05.2015   
Singulus Technologies AG
Hanauer Landstrasse 103
63796 Kahl am Main / DE
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
26.08.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
12.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
06.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition31.07.2019Appeal received No.  J0010/19
29.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1389/18
17.12.2018Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
16.01.2018Appeal received No.  T1389/18
17.12.2018Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
15.01.2018Appeal received No.  T1389/18
29.06.2018Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2018/26]
17.12.2018Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
16.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
06.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Stay/Interruption01.08.2017Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2018/04]
01.08.2018Resumption of proceedings[2018/04]
01.06.2018Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2018/35]
01.10.2018Resumption of proceedings[2018/35]
03.04.2018Resumption of proceedings[2018/15]
01.08.2017Interruption of proceedings, reason: legal prevention of applicant[2018/15]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
MT27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
IE06.11.2014
LU06.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2015/50]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SI27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
IE06.11.2014
LU06.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/46]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
IE06.11.2014
LU06.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/32]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
MC27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
LU06.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/30]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
LU06.11.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/24]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
PL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/23]CY27.08.2014
CZ27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
EE27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
SK27.08.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/22]CY27.08.2014
DK27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/16]CY27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
NL27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
LV27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
NO27.11.2014
IS27.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY27.08.2014
FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
NO27.11.2014
Former [2015/10]FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
NO27.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI27.08.2014
LT27.08.2014
SE27.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT27.08.2014
Cited inInternational search[A]US2006157733  (LUCOVSKY GERALD [US] ET AL) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0012] - [0022] - [0030] - [0036] - [0043] , [0049] , [0060] , [0061]; figures 4a,4b *;
 [A]EP1489667  (IMEC INTER UNI MICRO ELECTR [BE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0031] - [0042]; figure 8 *
 [A]  - HOEX B ET AL, Excellent passivation of highly doped p-type Si surfaces by the negative-charge-dielectric Al2O3, APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, PAGE(S) 112107 - 112107, (20070911), ISSN 0003-6951, XP012099144 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.2784168
Examination   - HAVERKAMP H ET AL, "A Process Design for the Production of IBC Solar Cells on Multi-Crystalline Silicon", 2006 IEEE 4TH WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION, (20060501), ISBN 978-1-4244-0016-4, pages 1365 - 1367, XP031007570
    - LEE ET AL, "Investigation of various surface passivation schemes for silicon solar cells", SOLAR ENERGY MATERIALS AND SOLAR CELLS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20060106), vol. 90, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.SOLMAT.2005.02.007, ISSN 0927-0248, pages 82 - 92, XP005149780

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.solmat.2005.02.007
    - ULYASHIN A G ET AL, "Hydrogen Release and Defect Formation During Heat Treatments of SiNx:H/a-Si: H Double Passivation Layer on C-SI Substrate", 2006 IEEE 4TH WORLD CONFERENCE ON PHOTOVOLTAIC ENERGY CONVERSION, (20060501), ISBN 978-1-4244-0016-4, pages 1354 - 1357, XP031007567
    - TUCCI M ET AL, "Characterization of SiNx/a-Si:H Crystalline Silicon Surface Passivation Under UV Light Exposure", 21ST EUROPEAN PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE , DRESDEN, GERMANY, 4 - 8 SEPTEMBER 2006, WIP RENEWABLE ENERGIES, MÜNCHEN, (20060904), ISBN 978-3-936338-20-1, pages 1404 - 1407, XP040512455